DesRoches v. US Postal Service, Postmaster General

Case Number: 1:2005cv00088
Filed: March 17, 2005
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (ADA 1990)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2009 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO RELEASE FUNDS AND TO QUASH WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT as to Northeast Credit Union. Signed by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (vln)
November 19, 2009 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO RELEASE FUNDS AND TO QUASH WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT as to Bellwether Community Credit Union. Signed by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (vln)
December 14, 2009 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO RELEASE FUNDS AND TO QUASH WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT as to 105 Writ of Continuing Garnishment. Signed by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (vln)
June 12, 2006 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. So Ordered by Judge Paul Barbadoro. (ja, )
September 17, 2008 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 59 Objection to Magistrate Judge's Decision (Rule 72(a)). So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (jar)
September 17, 2008 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruled as moot 59 Objection to Magistrate Judge's Decision (Rule 72(a)) Signed by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (jar)
September 17, 2008 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting 41 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (jar)
May 5, 2009 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting 72 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (jna) Modified on 5/12/2009 to add: ///(vln).
July 2, 2009 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting 95 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (vln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DesRoches v. US Postal Service, Postmaster General
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]