Wolff v. NH Department of Corrections et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Charles Jay Wolff alleged that the New Hampshire Department of Corrections have denied him a kosher diet consistent with his faith, thereby abridging his right to freely exercise his religion and substantially burdening his religious practices. Plaintiff also filed a hard-boiled egg as a part of his preliminary injunction request. The judge issued an order to destroy the egg and wrote the order in the style of Green Eggs and Ham.

Defendant: James Daley, Jeff Perkins and NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Charles Jay Wolff
 
Case Number: 1:2006cv00321
Filed: September 5, 2006
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
County: Merrimack
Presiding Judge: Paul Barbadoro
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2009 Appeal Record Returned/Certification. (LL)
October 13, 2009 190 MANDATE of USCA as to 148 Notice of Appeal filed by Charles Jay Wolff, 184 Notice of Appeal filed by Charles Jay Wolff case Affirmed.( Appeal Record follow-up for return of record from USCA by 11/16/2009.) (mm)
June 23, 2009 189 MANDATE of USCA as to 148 Notice of Appeal filed by Charles Jay Wolff, 184 Notice of Appeal filed by Charles Jay Wolff case Affirmed. Appeal Record follow-up for return of record from USCA by 7/27/2009. (mm)
October 17, 2008 188 Featured Case ORDER of USCA re: payment of filing fee from prison trust account as to 184 Notice of Appeal filed by Charles Jay Wolff (vln)
October 1, 2008 187 Clerk's Supplemental Certificate transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 184 Notice of Appeal, with documents numbered Notlce No Designation of Exhibits and 187. (jar)
October 1, 2008 Notice - No Exhibit Designation Filed. Pursuant to LR 83.13(d), the parties are required to file a designation of exhibits necessary for the determination of the appeal. This notice is to advise the court of appeals that as of this date no exhibit designations have been filed in this case. A copy of this entry sent to the Court of Appeals. (jar)
August 13, 2008 Appellate Case Number: First Circuit Court of Appeals 08-2005 re 184 Notice of Appeal filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (vln)
August 6, 2008 186 Clerk's Certificate transmitting Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals, documents numbered 1-186, re 184 Notice of Appeal. A copy of the Notice of Appeal mailed to all parties this date. (vln)
August 6, 2008 185 Appeal Cover Sheet as to 184 Notice of Appeal filed by Charles Jay Wolff (vln)
August 1, 2008 184 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 181 Judgment, by Charles Jay Wolff. File-stamped copy to be sent to parties/USCA by Clerks Office. Designation of Exhibits Deadline set for 9/3/2008. (mxm)
July 24, 2008 183 RESPONSE re 177 MOTION of violation of due process (replaces Document No. 182) filed by NH Department of Corrections, Jeff Perkins. (Weissbard, Deborah)
July 23, 2008 182 Objection to Plaintiff's Motion by NH Department of Corrections, Jeff Perkins (Weissbard, Deborah)
July 21, 2008 Appeal Record Returned/Certification: (mxm)
July 21, 2008 181 JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with 138 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Dismiss, 12 Report and Recommendations/Order Directing Service, 179 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Clerk James R. Starr. (Case Closed) (mxm)
July 21, 2008 180 MANDATE of USCA as to 76 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Charles Jay Wolff, 81 Notice of Appeal, filed by Charles Jay Wolff case appeal dismissed. (mxm)
July 21, 2008 179 Featured Case ORDER granting 155 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (jna)
July 17, 2008 178 REPLY to Objection to Motion re 155 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment (Supplemental) filed by Jeff Perkins. (Weissbard, Deborah)
July 8, 2008 177 MOTION of violation of due process filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Follow up on Objection on 7/25/2008. (mxm)
July 8, 2008 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 172 Motion to Strike 171 Objection. Text of Order: Denied. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (jna)
July 7, 2008 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 173 Motion to subpoena 2 key witnesses. Text of Order: Denied. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (jna)
July 2, 2008 176 OBJECTION to 172 MOTION to Strike 171 Objection to Objection served on 6/26/08 filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (mxm)
July 2, 2008 175 OBJECTION to 173 MOTION for the NH Department of Justice subpoena the 2 key witnesses filed by Jeff Perkins. (Weissbard, Deborah)
June 30, 2008 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 170 Motion to Strike. Text of Order: Denied So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (mm)
June 26, 2008 174 OBJECTION to 170 MOTION to Strike 168 Objection to Reply to Objection to Second Summary Judgment Motion served on 6/20/08 filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (mxm)
June 25, 2008 173 MOTION for the NH Department of Justice subpoena the 2 key witnesses filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 6/25/08. Follow up on Objection on 7/14/2008. (mxm)
June 25, 2008 172 MOTION to Strike 171 Objection to Objection filed by Jeff Perkins. Follow up on Objection on 7/14/2008. (Weissbard, Deborah)
June 23, 2008 171 Objection to 169 Objection to Motion filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (mxm)
June 18, 2008 170 MOTION to Strike 168 Objection to Reply to Objection to Second Summary Judgment Motion filed by Jeff Perkins. Follow up on Objection on 7/7/2008. (Weissbard, Deborah)
June 17, 2008 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 164 Motion to Obtain Addresses of Two Witnesses. Text of Order: Denied. Plaintiff's communications with these retired employees must go through defense counsel for security reasons. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (sls)
June 16, 2008 169 OBJECTION to 164 MOTION to obtain addresses of 2 witnesses filed by Jeff Perkins. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Aff Cascio, # 2 Attachment to Exhibit A-1)(Weissbard, Deborah)
June 13, 2008 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 162 Motion for Late Entry to File a Reply to Plaintiff's "Motion" One Day Late. Text of Order: Granted So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (jna)
June 12, 2008 168 Objection to 163 Reply to Objection to Motion filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (mxm)
June 12, 2008 167 OBJECTION to 162 MOTION Motion for Late Entry to File a Reply to Plaintiff's "Motion" One Day Late served on 6/2/08 filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (mxm)
June 10, 2008 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 165 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Reply. Text of Order: Granted So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (jna)
June 10, 2008 166 OBJECTION to 165 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Reply to Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Second Motion for Summary Judgment served on 5/9/08 filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (mxm)
June 6, 2008 165 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Reply to Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Second Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Jeff Perkins. Follow up on Objection on 6/23/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh A-Supp. Reply, # 2 Attachment to Exhibit Exh 1-memo of law, # 3 Attachment to Exhibit Exh 2-Canteen list 05, # 4 Attachment to Exhibit Exh 3-Canteen list 08, # 5 Attachment to Exhibit Exh 4-Perkins Affidavit)(Weissbard, Deborah)
June 5, 2008 164 MOTION to obtain addresses of 2 witnesses filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 5/29/08. Follow up on Objection on 6/23/2008. (mxm)
May 28, 2008 163 REPLY to Objection to Motion re 155 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jeff Perkins. (Weissbard, Deborah)
May 28, 2008 162 MOTION Motion for Late Entry to File a Reply to Plaintiff's "Motion" One Day Late filed by Jeff Perkins. Follow up on Objection on 6/16/2008. (Weissbard, Deborah)
May 20, 2008 161 Letter to Charles Wolfe from Daniel Lynch re: cost of copy of docket sheet (mxm)
May 19, 2008 160 Letter to Daniel Lynch from Charles Wolfe re: copies of docket sheet (mxm)
May 15, 2008 159 OBJECTION to 155 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment served on 5/7/08 filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Follow up on Objection on 6/2/2008. (mxm)
May 15, 2008 158 Objection to 156 Pretrial Statement filed by Jeff Perkins. (Weissbard, Deborah)
May 14, 2008 157 Notice of Intent to Reply to Objection to 155 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment. Follow up on Reply on 6/2/2008. (Weissbard, Deborah)
May 13, 2008 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER overruling 147 Objection to Order on document #134. Text of Order: Objection overruled Signed by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (mm)
May 13, 2008 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER overruling 146 Objection to Order on document #135. Text of Order: Objection overruled Signed by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (mm)
May 13, 2008 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER overruling 151 Objection to order on document #140. Text of Order: Objection overruled Signed by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (mm)
May 7, 2008 156 Pretrial Statement filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (vln)
May 5, 2008 TRIAL NOTICE: LR 16.2(d) Objections due 8/15/2008. Bench Trial set for the two-week period beginning 9/3/2008 09:30 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2008 02:30 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Pretrial Statements due 8/1/2008. (jar)
May 2, 2008 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 149 Motion to Continue and Extend Deadlines. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (jna)
May 2, 2008 155 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jeff Perkins. Follow up on Objection on 6/4/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law Wolff Memo of Law, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit (Affidavit) Daly Aff-C, # 5 Attachment to Exhibit C-1, # 6 Attachment to Exhibit C-2, # 7 Exhibit (Affidavit) Perkins Aff-D, # 8 Attachment to Exhibit D-1, # 9 Attachment to Exhibit D-2, # 10 Attachment to Exhibit D-3, # 11 Attachment to Exhibit D-4, # 12 Attachment to Exhibit D-5, # 13 Attachment to Exhibit D-6)(Weissbard, Deborah)
May 1, 2008 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 150 Motion to Exclude. Text of Order: Denied. The Rabbi has and certainly would qualify as an expert on relevant aspects of the Jewish faith. While a report and opinion were not timely disclosed as required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(2)(B), it is far from clear that one is necessary since the Rabbi has not been retained or employed by Plaintiff. It appears that he was timely disclosed under Rule 26(a)(2)(A). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (sls)
May 1, 2008 153 Notice of Intent to Reply to Objection to 149 MOTION to Continue and Extend Deadlines for Second Summary Judgment Motion and Continue Remaining Trial Dates. Follow up on Reply on 5/19/2008. (Weissbard, Deborah)
April 30, 2008 154 OBJECTION to 150 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Witness served on 4/28/08 filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (mxm)
April 25, 2008 152 OBJECTION to 149 MOTION to Continue and Extend Deadlines for Second Summary Judgment Motion and Continue Remaining Trial Dates served on 4/22/08 filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Page 15)(mxm)
April 21, 2008 150 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Witness filed by NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, Jeff Perkins. Follow up on Objection on 5/8/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-10-25-07, # 2 Exhibit B-11-1-07, # 3 Exhibit C-11-13-07)(Weissbard, Deborah)
April 17, 2008 151 Objection to Order on Motion for Discovery, filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (mxm)
April 16, 2008 149 MOTION to Continue and Extend Deadlines for Second Summary Judgment Motion and Continue Remaining Trial Dates filed by NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, Jeff Perkins. Follow up on Objection on 5/5/2008. (Weissbard, Deborah)
April 15, 2008 148 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 138 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Charles Jay Wolff. File-stamped copy to be sent to parties/USCA by Clerks Office. (mxm)
April 8, 2008 147 Objection to Order on 134 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (mxm)
April 8, 2008 146 Objection to Order on 135 for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (mxm)
April 8, 2008 145 Objection to Order on 136 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (mxm)
April 8, 2008 144 RESPONSE re 135 MOTION re: aiding and abetting the destruction of evidence filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (mxm)
April 8, 2008 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 140 Motion for Discovery. Text of Order: Denied. Defendant was granted summary judgment with respect to the type of kosher meals which is apparently what the discovery is aimed at. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (sls)
April 7, 2008 143 Objection to 139 Response (to terminated motion) (replaces Document No.141) filed by NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, Jeff Perkins. (Weissbard, Deborah)
April 7, 2008 142 OBJECTION to 140 MOTION for Discovery filed by NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, Jeff Perkins. (Weissbard, Deborah)
April 7, 2008 141 RESPONSE re 132 MOTION Due Process (Defendants' Objection to Plaintiff's Document No. 139) filed by James Daley, Jeff Perkins. (Weissbard, Deborah)
April 7, 2008 140 MOTION for Discovery filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 3/27/08. Follow up on Objection on 4/24/2008. (mm)
April 3, 2008 139 RESPONSE re 132 MOTION Due Process filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (mm)
April 2, 2008 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 101 Motion to Strike As Moot Argument with Respect to Commissioner Wrenn Contained in Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (jna)
April 2, 2008 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 132 Motion for Due Process. Text of Order: Plaintiff brings a request for relief that he characterizes as a motion for due process. Because plaintiff has failed to indicate what relief he seeks as a result of this alleged constitutional violation, I deny the motion. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (jna)
April 2, 2008 138 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 96 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (jna)
March 27, 2008 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 136 Motion for re: Becky Harding/library. Text of Order: Denied as illegible So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Justo Arenas. (mm)
March 27, 2008 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 135 Motion for re: aiding and abetting the destruction of evidence. Text of Order: Denied as illegible So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Justo Arenas. (mm)
March 27, 2008 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 134 Motion for emergency relief. Text of Order: Denied as illegible So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Justo Arenas. (mm)
March 26, 2008 137 OBJECTION to 135 MOTION re: aiding and abetting the destruction of evidence filed by NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, Gency Morse, James Daley, Jeff Perkins. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Obj-DP-#1, # 2 Attachment to Exhibit A, # 3 Attachment to Exhibit B, # 4 Attachment to Exhibit C, # 5 Attachment to Exhibit D, # 6 Attachment to Exhibit E, # 7 Attachment to Exhibit F, # 8 Attachment to Exhibit G, # 9 Attachment to Exhibit H)(Weissbard, Deborah)
March 26, 2008 136 MOTION re: Becky Harding/library filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 3/22/08. Follow up on Objection on 4/14/2008. (mxm)
March 26, 2008 135 MOTION re: aiding and abetting the destruction of evidence filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 3/22/08. Follow up on Objection on 4/14/2008. (mxm)
March 26, 2008 134 MOTION for emergency relief filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 3/22/08. Follow up on Objection on 4/14/2008. (mxm)
March 21, 2008 133 OBJECTION to 132 MOTION Due Process filed by NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, James Daley, Jeff Perkins. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Inc.Rep., # 2 Exhibit B-State, # 3 Exhibit C-3 State, # 4 Exhibit D-CellHX, # 5 Exhibit E-Inv., # 6 Exhibit F-Inc.Rep, # 7 Exhibit G-59C, # 8 Exhibit H-D Rep.)(Weissbard, Deborah)
March 6, 2008 132 MOTION for Due Process filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 3/4/08. Follow up on Objection on 3/24/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Inmate Request Slip)(vln)
February 28, 2008 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice 130 Motion Text of Order: Denied without prejudice to refiling something I can read - i.e. that is legible So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (mxm)
February 28, 2008 131 OBJECTION to 130 MOTION filed by NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, James Daley, Jeff Perkins. (Weissbard, Deborah)
February 26, 2008 130 MOTION filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 2/22/08. Follow up on Objection on 3/14/2008. (mxm)
February 20, 2008 129 Letter to Daniel Lynch from Charles Wolff re: saying thank you (mxm)
February 12, 2008 128 Letter to Charles Wolf from Daniel Lynch re: Mr. Wolf's letter of 2/8/08 (mxm)
February 12, 2008 127 Letter to Daniel Lynch from Charles Wolff (mxm)
January 31, 2008 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 122 Motion of Conspiracy. Text of Order: Denied. The Attorney General is counsel to the defendant and may examine any records kept by her client. So Ordered by Judge James R. Muirhead. (sls)
January 29, 2008 126 Featured Case ORDER/OPINION of USCA as to 76 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Charles Jay Wolff, 81 Notice of Appeal, filed by Charles Jay Wolff re: payment of appeal fee (mxm)
January 29, 2008 125 OBJECTION to 122 MOTION of conspiracy filed by NH Department of Corrections, James Daley, Jeff Perkins. (Weissbard, Deborah)
January 24, 2008 124 Letter to Charles Wolff from Daniel Lynch re: return of his exhibits (mm)
January 24, 2008 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 103 Motion for for perjury against 3 employees. Text of Order: Denied So Ordered by Judge Justo Arenas. (mm)
January 23, 2008 123 Letter to Janice Bushold from Charles Wolff re: the exhibits returned to him (mm)
January 23, 2008 122 MOTION of conspiracy filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 1/18/08. Follow up on Objection on 2/11/2008. (Attachments:, # 1 Exhibit A - 1/8/08 Inmate Request Slip)(mxm)
January 23, 2008 121 Letter to Charles Wolff from Daniel Lynch re: Mr. Wolff's 1/17/08 letter (mxm)
January 23, 2008 120 OBJECTION to 103 MOTION for perjury against 3 prison employees filed by NH Department of Corrections, James Daley, Jeff Perkins. (Weissbard, Deborah)
January 23, 2008 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 117 Motion re: Fresh Fruit. Text of Order: Denied. So Ordered by Judge Justo Arenas. (sls)
January 22, 2008 119 Letter to Janice Bushold from Charles Wolff re: his exhibits (mxm)
January 22, 2008 118 Receipt of the Exhibits listed on 47 Exhibit List filed by Charles Jay Wolff are hereby acknowledged (mxm)
January 22, 2008 117 MOTION re: fresh fruit filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 1/4/08. Follow up on Objection on 2/8/2008. (mxm) Modified on 1/23/2008 to add: document relationship to document #115 (MM).
January 22, 2008 116 REPLY to Objection to Motion re 96 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NH Department of Corrections, James Daley, Jeff Perkins. (Weissbard, Deborah)
January 22, 2008 115 Objection to Plaintiff's Motion 117 Dated January 4, 2008 by NH Department of Corrections, James Daley, Jeff Perkins (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Wolff's Mot# 2 Exhibit (Affidavit) B-Aff-Bilodeau)(Weissbard, Deborah) Modified on 1/22/2008 to add:link to document #117 (MM).
January 18, 2008 114 Receipt of the Exhibits listed on 48 Exhibit List filed by NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner are hereby acknowledged (mxm)
January 16, 2008 Return of Exhibits listed on 47 Exhibit List to Plaintiff. Notice of Compliance Deadline set for 2/19/2008. (jgb)
January 16, 2008 Return of Exhibits listed on 48 Exhibit List to Defendant. Notice of Compliance Deadline set for 2/19/2008. (jgb)
January 15, 2008 110 Objection to 102 Notice of Intent to Reply filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (mxm)
January 15, 2008 108 Letter to Chales Wolff from Chief Deputy Daniel Lynch re: letters dated December 22, 26, 31,2007 and January 7, 2008 (#104, 105, 106 and 107) (jgb)
January 10, 2008 111 Addendum/5/1/07 Inmate Request Slip to 103 MOTION for perjury against 3 prison employees by Charles Jay Wolff. (mxm)
January 10, 2008 103 MOTION for perjury against 3 prison employees filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 1/3/08. Follow up on Objection on 1/28/2008. (Attachments:, # 1 Exhibit A - 10/20/05 Inmate Request Slip, # 2 Exhibit B - 1/29/06 Grievance Form, # 3 Exhibit B -1 - 3/24/06 Grievance Form, # 4 Exhibit C - 10/25/05 Inmate Request Slip, # 5 Exhibit D - 4/26/07 Inmate Request Slip, # 6 Exhibit E - 1 - 5/1/07 Inmate Request Slip, # 7 Exhibit E -2 5/1/07 Inmate Request Slip)(mxm)
January 10, 2008 102 Notice of Intent to Reply to Objection to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion. Follow up on Reply on 1/28/2008. (Weissbard, Deborah)
January 9, 2008 109 OBJECTION to 96 MOTION for Summary Judgment served on 1/9/08 filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Follow up on Objection on 1/28/2008. (Attachments:, # 1 Exhibit A - NH Admin Rule Cor 301.03 Food Service, # 2 Exhibit B - Constitution Artilce 1, # 3 Exhibit C - NH DOC re: Religious Programming and Diets, # 4 Exhibit D - Inmate Request Slip, # 5 Exhibit E - NH RSA 623-C:2 2007, # 6 Exhibit F - 12/27/05 Inmate Request Slip, # 7 Exhibit G - 8/31/07 Inmate Request Slip, # 8 Exhibit H - Progress Notes, # 9 Exhibit I - 5/28/07 Inmate Request Slip, # 10 Exhibit J - 6/11/07 Inmate Request Slip, # 11 Exhibit K - Patient profile report, # 12 Exhibit L - Report of Coronary Intervention, # 13 Exhibit M - History and Physical Exam, # 14 Exhibit N - Inmate ID Card, # 15 Exhibit O - Inmate ID Card, # 16 Exhibit P US Codes42: 1983)(mxm)
January 9, 2008 106 Letter to Chief Deputy Daniel Lynch dated 1/7/08 from Charles Wolff re: two previous letters (jgb)
January 9, 2008 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 95 Motion to Compel. Text of Order: Denied. Plaintiff may not like the particular kosher food but the prison verified that it is kosher. So Ordered by Judge James R. Muirhead. (sls)
January 7, 2008 101 MOTION to Strike As Moot Argument with Respect to Commissioner Wrenn Contained in Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law filed by NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, NH Department of Corrections, James Daley, Jeff Perkins. Follow up on Objection on 1/25/2008. (Weissbard, Deborah)
January 4, 2008 99 OBJECTION to 95 MOTION to Compel the kitchen to give the plaintiff only prepackaged kosher foods filed by NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, James Daley, Jeff Perkins. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) A-Bilodeau Aff# 2 Exhibit (Affidavit) B-Perkins Aff# 3 Exhibit IRS-1/4/08# 4 Exhibit (Affidavit) D-Englander Aff)(Weissbard, Deborah)
January 4, 2008 98 Clerk's Supplemental Certificate transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 76 Notice of Appeal 81 Notice of Appeal,with documents numbered 89 with endorsed order and 97 transcript. (jgb)
January 4, 2008 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 87 Motion to Clarify. Text of Order: Granted. The motion to compel was, on motion, revisited and denied. So Ordered by Judge James R. Muirhead. (sls)
January 3, 2008 107 Letter to Chief Deputy Daniel Lynch dated 12/31/07 from Charles Wolff re: Affidavit (jgb)
January 2, 2008 100 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings for Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on August 1, 2007. Court Reporter: Susan Bateman, Telephone # 603-225-1453. NOTICE: You do NOT get a free look at transcripts nor are they available on PACER. If you would like to order a copy, please contact the court reporter at the above listed phone number. (kad)
January 2, 2008 97 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings for Preliminary Injunction hearing before Magistrate Judge Muirhead held on 8/1/07. Court Reporter: Susan Bateman, Telephone # 603 225-1453. NOTICE: You do NOT get a free look at transcripts nor are they available on PACER. If you would like to order a copy, please contact the court reporter at the above listed phone number. (mxm)
January 2, 2008 96 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, NH Department of Corrections, James Daley, Jeff Perkins. Follow up on Objection on 2/4/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law Wolff-Memo of Law# 2 Exhibit A-Tr Wolff Testimony# 3 Exhibit (Affidavit) B-Perkins Aff# 4 Exhibit C-PPD 7.17# 5 Exhibit (Affidavit) D-Englander Aff# 6 Exhibit E-Tr Leeka/Stacy)(Weissbard, Deborah)
December 30, 2007 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 89 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal as to Charles Wolff. Text of Order: Granted So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (mm)
December 28, 2007 105 Letter dated 12/22/07 to Daniel Lynch from Charles Wolff re: Habeas Forms (jgb)
December 28, 2007 104 Letter to Chief Deputy Lynch from Charles Wolff (jgb)
December 21, 2007 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal re 76 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Charles Jay Wolff, 81 Notice of Appeal, filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Appellate Case Number: cca 07-2743 (mm)
December 21, 2007 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 90 Motion for Pejury. Text of Order: Denied. So Ordered by Judge James R. Muirhead. (sls)
December 20, 2007 94 Letter to Charles Wolff from Daniel Lynch re: Mr. Wolff's letter received 12/17/07 (mxm)
December 19, 2007 92 OBJECTION to 90 MOTION for perjury Against Deborah B. Weissbard replaces Document No. 91 filed by NH Department of Corrections, James Daley, Jeff Perkins. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) A-Watt Aff# 2 Exhibit B-ECF Notice# 3 Exhibit C-DOC Memo# 4 Exhibit D-IRS)(Weissbard, Deborah)
December 19, 2007 91 OBJECTION to 90 MOTION for perjury Against Deborah B. Weissbard filed by NH Department of Corrections, James Daley, Jeff Perkins. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Watt Aff# 2 Exhibit B-ECF Notice# 3 Exhibit C-DOC Memo# 4 Civil Cover Sheet D-IRS)(Weissbard, Deborah)
December 18, 2007 95 MOTION to Compel the kitchen to give the plaintiff only prepackaged kosher foods filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 12/17/07. Follow up on Objection on 1/7/2008. (Attachments:, # 1 Exhibit A - Inmate Request Slip)(mxm)
December 17, 2007 93 Letter to Daniel Lynch from Charles Wolff (mxm)
December 17, 2007 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 86 Motion for Jury Demand. Text of Order: Denied. It is too late to demand a jury. So Ordered by Judge James R. Muirhead. (sls)
December 13, 2007 90 MOTION for perjury against Deborah Weissbard filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 12/13/07. Follow up on Objection on 12/31/2007. (Attachments:, # 1 Exhibit 1 - Envelope, # 2 Exhibit A-K Pages of Manual for Guidance of Inmates)(mxm)
December 12, 2007 89 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis on Appeal with Financial Affidavit filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Follow up on Objection on 12/31/2007. (Attachments:, # 1 Cover letter)(mxm)
December 10, 2007 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 85 Motion for Perjury. Text of Order: Denied. So Ordered by Judge James R. Muirhead. (sls)
December 6, 2007 88 OBJECTION to 85 MOTION FOR PERJURY filed by NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, James Daley, Jeff Perkins. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Corporal Knieriemen# 2 Exhibit Inmate Manual# 3 Exhibit Manual-Section 6# 4 Exhibit Booking Information Sheet)(Weissbard, Deborah)
December 4, 2007 87 MOTION to Clarify Order on Motion for Reconsideration filed by NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, James Daley, Jeff Perkins. Follow up on Objection on 12/21/2007. (Weissbard, Deborah)
November 30, 2007 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 77 Motion for Reconsideration. Re: Order on Motion to Compel. Text of Order: Granted. In the interests of justice So Ordered by Judge James R. Muirhead. (mm)
November 27, 2007 86 MOTION Jury demand filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 11/20/07. Follow up on Objection on 12/14/2007. (mxm)
November 27, 2007 85 MOTION filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Follow up on Objection on 12/14/2007. (mxm)
November 27, 2007 84 OBJECTION to 77 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Compel and Motion for Leave to File Late Objection served on 11/20/07 filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (Attachments:, # 1 Exhibit 1 - NH DMV letter re: drivers manuals)(mxm)
November 27, 2007 83 Appeal Cover Sheet as to 76 Notice of Appeal, filed by Charles Jay Wolff, 81 Notice of Appeal, filed by Charles Jay Wolff (amm)
November 27, 2007 82 Clerk's Certificate transmitting Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals, documents numbered 5,7,9-12, 14,14.1,16,20, 23, 38-40.1,47-50.1,52-60, 62, 64-66.1, 70, 73,74, 76,81, re 76 Notice of Appeal, 81 Notice of Appeal. A copy of the Notice of Appeal mailed to all parties this date. (amm)
November 16, 2007 80 Letter to Charles Wolff from Daniel Lynch re: Mr. Wolff's letters received on 11/14 and 11/15/2007 (mxm)
November 16, 2007 77 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Compel and Motion for Leave to File Late Objection filed by NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, James Daley, Jeff Perkins. Follow up on Objection on 12/6/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit #1 - PPD 5.26# 2 Exhibit (Affidavit) #2 - Cpl. R. Knieriemen)(Weissbard, Deborah)
November 15, 2007 79 Letter to Daniel Lynch from Charles Wolff re: cost for issuane of summons (mxm)
November 14, 2007 78 Letter to Daniel Lynch from Charles Wolff re: copies of documents (mxm)
November 9, 2007 75 Notice to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Deborah B. Weissbard. Attorney Nancy J. Smith terminated. (Weissbard, Deborah)
November 8, 2007 76 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 65 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 52 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 60 Motion for Contempt, 53 Motion for Contempt, 54 Motion to Compel, 38 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 55 Motion for Contempt, 58 Motion for Contempt, recommending thatREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 52 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 60 Motion for Contempt, 53 Motion for Contempt, 54 Motion to Compel, 38 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 55 Motion for Contempt, 58 Motion for Contempt, recommending that, 73 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion for Contempt,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,, Order on Report and Recommendations, by Charles Jay Wolff. File-stamped copy to be sent to parties/USCA by Clerks Office. (mxm)
November 8, 2007 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 30 Motion to Dismiss Commissioner Wrenn as a Defendant. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (jna)
November 8, 2007 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 37 Motion to Amend 7 Addendum. Text of Order: Denied. LR 15.1 has not been complied with and the issues and potential claims are apparently not related to the pending claims and must be filed as a separate suit. So Ordered by Judge James R. Muirhead. (sls)
November 8, 2007 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 32 Motion to Compel. Text of Order: Denied. Beyond the scope of relevant issues in this case. So Ordered by Judge James R. Muirhead. (sls)
November 8, 2007 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 34 Motion to remove the K from the Canteen list. Text of Order: Denied. So Ordered by Judge James R. Muirhead. (sls)
November 8, 2007 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 33 Motion to Compel. Text of Order: Granted. No objection filed. So Ordered by Judge James R. Muirhead. (sls)
November 6, 2007 81 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 73 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Contempt, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Report and Recommendations, by Charles Jay Wolff. File-stamped copy to be sent to parties/USCA by Clerks Office.Designation of Exhibits Deadline set for 12/10/2007. (This Document was filed at the 1st CCA on 11/6/07. 1st CCA forward document to this court.) (amm)
November 6, 2007 74 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings for Excerpt of Charles Wolff testimony from Preliminary Injunction hearing before Judge Magistrate held on 08/01/2007. Court Reporter: Susan Bateman, Telephone # 603 225-1453. NOTICE: You do NOT get a free look at transcripts nor are they available on PACER. If you would like to order a copy, please contact the court reporter at the above listed phone number. (mm)
October 30, 2007 73 Featured Case ORDER denying 38 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 52 Motion for contempt; denying 53 Motion for Contempt; denying 54 Motion to Compel; denying 55 Motion for Contempt; denying 58 Motion for Contempt; denying 60 Motion for Contempt; approving 65 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (mm)
October 30, 2007 72 Letter to Charles Wolff from Daniel Lynch re: Mr. Wolff's letter regarding points of interest (mxm)
October 30, 2007 71 Letter to Daniel Lynch, Chief Deputy Clerk from Charles Wolff re: Points of Information (mxm)
October 24, 2007 70 OBJECTION to 65 Report and Recommendations filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (Attachments:, # 1 Exhibit 1 - 8/17/07 Inmate request)(mxm)
October 23, 2007 69 Letter to Charles Wolff from Daniel Lynch re: Mr. Wolff's pleading (Attachments:, # 1 Mr. Wolff's pleading, # 2 Inmate Request Slip) (mxm)
October 23, 2007 68 Letter to Charles Wolff from Daniel Lynch re: procedure for obtaining transcripts (mxm)
October 22, 2007 67 Letter to Daniel Lynch from Charles Wolff re: transcript of preliminary injunction hearing (mxm)
October 19, 2007 66 Objection to 64 Objection to Motion filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (Attachments:, # 1 Exhibit 1 - Inmate Request Slips)(mxm)
October 17, 2007 65 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 52 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 60 Motion for Contempt, 53 Motion for Contempt, 54 Motion to Compel, 38 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 55 Motion for Contempt, 58 Motion for Contempt, recommending that the motions be denied. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 11/5/2007. Signed by Judge James R. Muirhead. (mxm)
October 12, 2007 64 OBJECTION to 60 MOTION for Contempt, 58 MOTION for Contempt filed by NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, James Daley, Jeff Perkins. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Dietician consult)(Smith, Nancy)
October 5, 2007 63 Letter to Charles Wolff from Daniel Lynch re: Mr. Wolff letter re: the "provisional" report and recommendation (mxm)
October 2, 2007 62 REPLY to Objection to Motion re 53 MOTION for Contempt, 54 MOTION to Compel the prison to provide the plaintiff with 3 nutritious meals per day, 55 MOTION for Contempt filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (mxm)
September 28, 2007 61 NOTICE of Disclosure of expert by Charles Jay Wolff. (mxm)
September 28, 2007 60 MOTION for Contempt for serving hard boiled eggs again filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 9/26/07. Follow up on Objection on 10/18/2007. (mxm)
September 28, 2007 59 OBJECTION to 53 MOTION for Contempt, 54 MOTION to Compel the prison to provide the plaintiff with 3 nutritious meals per day, 55 MOTION for Contempt filed by NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, James Daley, Jeff Perkins. (Livernois, Andrew)
September 26, 2007 58 MOTION for Contempt and disrespect filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 9/24/07. Follow up on Objection on 10/15/2007. (Attachments:, # 1 Exhibit 1- 9/19/07 Inmate Request Slip)(mxm)
September 21, 2007 57 RESPONSE re 56 Order filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (mxm)
September 18, 2007 56 Featured Case ORDER the egg filed by the plaintiff is to be destroyed re: 55 Motion for Contempt,injunction. Signed by Judge James R. Muirhead. (mxm)
September 17, 2007 55 MOTION for Contempt/Perjury of certain prison employees filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 9//13/07. Follow up on Objection on 10/4/2007. Certain exhibit(s) maintained conventionally in Clerks Office (hard boiled egg). (Attorney filers must submit conventional materials to the court within 72 hours.) (Attachments:, # 1 Exhibit 1 - 9/3/07 Inmate Request Slips)(mxm)
September 7, 2007 54 MOTION to Compel the prison to provide the plaintiff with 3 nutritious meals per day filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 9/5/07. Follow up on Objection on 9/24/2007. (mxm)
September 6, 2007 53 MOTION for Contempt of kitchen supervisor filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 9//4/07. Follow up on Objection on 9/24/2007. (mxm)
August 27, 2007 50 RESPONSE re 49 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, James Daley, Jeff Perkins. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Excerpts from Medical Records)(Livernois, Andrew)
August 23, 2007 52 MOTION to reconvene evidentiary hearing filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 8/20/07. Follow up on Objection on 9/10/2007. (mxm)
August 23, 2007 51 FILED IN ERROR - MOTION to reconvene the evidentiary hearing before Magistrate Judge Muirhead filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 8/20/07. Follow up on Objection on 9/10/2007. (mxm) Modified on 8/29/2007 to add: Filed in error, wrong document attached. See document #52 (MM).
August 23, 2007 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 43 Motion against the Mental Health Department. Text of Order: Denied. The motion does not qualify for ex parte consideration and in any event relates to old claims. So Ordered by Judge James R. Muirhead. (djb)
August 2, 2007 49 Featured Case ORDER taking under advisement 38 Motion for Preliminary Injunction.Respond due within 20 days So Ordered by Judge James R. Muirhead. (mxm)
August 1, 2007 48 Exhibit List for Preliminary Injunction Hearing 8/1/07 by NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, et al. (jgb)
August 1, 2007 47 Exhibit List for Preliminary Injunction Hearing 8/1/07 by Charles Jay Wolff. (jgb)
August 1, 2007 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge James R. Muirhead : EVIDENTIARY HEARING held on 8/1/2007 re: Preliminary Injunction Witnessess Appearing: Charles Jay Wolff, Richard Stacy, Joyce Leeka, Deacon James Daly. (Court Reporter: Susan Bateman) (Pltfs Atty: Charles Jay Wolff, pro se) (Defts Atty: Andrew Livernois, Esq.) Report and Recommendation to issue.(Total Hearing Time: 2:30) (jgb)
July 30, 2007 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 46 Motion for Subpoena. Text of Order: Denied. Subpoenas, whether to obtain records or for the appearance of witnesses, require that service of process and witness fees be paid for - even by in forma pauperis. So Ordered by Judge James R. Muirhead. (djb)
July 30, 2007 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 44 Motion to issue warrant to the US Marshal to seize as evidence plaintiff's medical records. Text of Order: Denied. Subpoenas, whether to obtain records or for the appearance of witnesses, require that service of process and witness fees be paid for - even by in forma pauperis litigants. So Ordered by Judge James R. Muirhead. (djb)
July 30, 2007 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 36 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Text of Order: Denied. So Ordered by Judge James R. Muirhead. (djb)
July 25, 2007 46 MOTION for Subpoena for prison employees and inmates to appear at the 8/1/07 hearing filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 7/23/07. Follow up on Objection on 8/13/2007. (mxm)
July 25, 2007 45 Objection to 41 Objection to Motion to amend filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (mxm)
July 25, 2007 44 MOTION to issue warrant to the US Marshal to seize as evidence plaintiff's medical records filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 07/23/07. Follow up on Objection on 8/13/2007. (mxm)
July 19, 2007 43 MOTION against the Mental Health Department filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 7/17/07. Follow up on Objection on 8/6/2007. (mxm)
July 18, 2007 42 Featured Case ORDER to Transport Charles Wolff on August 1, 2007 for Evidentiary from NH State Prison. Signed by Clerk James R. Starr. (amm)
July 18, 2007 NOTICE of Hearing re: 38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.Evidentiary Hearing set for 8/1/2007 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (amm)
July 17, 2007 41 OBJECTION to 37 MOTION to Amend 7 Addendum, 5 Complaint filed by NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, James Daley, Jeff Perkins. (Livernois, Andrew)
July 17, 2007 40 OBJECTION to 38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, James Daley, Jeff Perkins. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Jeff Perkins with two attachments)(Livernois, Andrew)
July 11, 2007 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 29 Ex Parte Motion. Text of Order: The motion is ordered unsealed. Denied So Ordered by Judge James R. Muirhead. (mxm)
July 6, 2007 39 Featured Case ORDER referring 38 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (mm)
July 3, 2007 38 MOTION for Emergency Injunctive relief filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Follow up on Objection on 7/23/2007. (mxm)
July 2, 2007 37 MOTION to Amend 7 Addendum, 5 Complaint filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Follow up on Objection on 7/20/2007. (mxm)
July 2, 2007 36 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 6/28/07. Follow up on Objection on 7/20/2007. (mxm)
June 28, 2007 35 Addendum/amendment deleting the mental and emotion part of the case to 10 Response, 5 Complaint by Charles Jay Wolff. (mxm)
June 27, 2007 34 MOTION for the department of corrections to remove the K from the Canteen list filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 6/25/07. Follow up on Objection on 7/16/2007. (mxm)
June 27, 2007 33 MOTION to Compel the mail room to give the inmate the mail without the ID number filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 6/25/07. Follow up on Objection on 7/16/2007. (mxm)
June 27, 2007 32 MOTION to Compel the department of corrections to abide by rules filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 6/25/07. Follow up on Objection on 7/16/2007. (mxm)
June 25, 2007 31 NOTICE that Donald Andrews will not be a defendant in this case by Charles Jay Wolff. (mxm)
June 25, 2007 30 MOTION to Dismiss Commissioner Wrenn as a defendant filed by Charles Jay Wolff. Served on 6/21/07. Follow up on Objection on 7/13/2007. (mxm)
June 19, 2007 29 Ex Parte MOTION requesting that the Mental Health department of the NH Prison have no contact with the plaintiff filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (mxm) Modified on 7/11/2007 to unseal the motion (MM)
May 16, 2007 TRIAL NOTICE: LR 16.2(d) Objections due 5/19/08.. Bench Trial set for 6/3/2008 09:30 AM before Judge Paul Barbadoro. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/21/2008 02:30 PM before Judge Paul Barbadoro. Pretrial Statements due 5/5/2008. (mxm, )
May 14, 2007 27 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (mxm, )
May 14, 2007 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER approving 25 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 2 DAYS. Case Track: Standard. Text of Order: Approved and adopted as a pretrial scheduling order. So Ordered by Judge James R. Muirhead. Summary Judgment Motions due by 1/2/2008. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 8/1/2007. (mxm, )
May 14, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James R. Muirhead. VIDEO CONFERENCE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 5/14/2007. Order to issue. (Court Reporter: Susan Bateman) (Pltfs Atty: Charles Jay Wolff, pro se) (Defts Atty: Andrew Livernois, Esq.)(Total Hearing Time: :22) (jgb, )
May 4, 2007 26 Letter to Charles Wolff from Daniel Lynch re: letters as requests (Attachments:, # 1 4/29/07 Letter from Charles Wolff, # 2 2/26/07 Letter from George Bush) (mxm, )
May 4, 2007 25 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, James Daley, Jeff Perkins. (Livernois, Andrew)
April 18, 2007 24 NOTICE of no objection to the Magistrate Judge having this case by Charles Jay Wolff. (mxm, )
April 11, 2007 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference Via Video Conference, Courtroom #1, set for 5/14/2007 11:45 AM before Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. Follow up on Discovery Plan 5/9/2007. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Muirhead but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(jgb, )
April 9, 2007 23 RESPONSE re 20 Answer to Complaint filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (Attachments:, # 1 Exhibit 1 - Miscellaneous Papers)(mxm, )
April 5, 2007 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles Jay Wolff (mxm, )
April 3, 2007 21 Agreement of Acceptance of Service by NH Department of Corrections (Livernois, Andrew)
April 2, 2007 20 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint filed by NH Department of Corrections, James Daley, Jeff Perkins. (Livernois, Andrew)
March 28, 2007 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 18 Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge James R. Muirhead. Answer due by 4/2/2007. (djb, )
March 26, 2007 19 OBJECTION to 18 MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to April 2, 2007 served on 3/20/07 filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (mxm, )
March 19, 2007 18 MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to April 2, 2007 filed by NH Department of Corrections, James Daley, Jeff Perkins. Follow up on Objection on 4/9/2007 (Livernois, Andrew)
February 20, 2007 16 Featured Case ///ORDER approving 12 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Judge Paul Barbadoro. (mxm, )
February 15, 2007 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles Jay Wolff (mxm, )
February 8, 2007 13 Agreement of Acceptance of Service by NH Department of Corrections, James Daley (Livernois, Andrew)
February 7, 2007 14 RESPONSE (pages 1-28) to Motion re 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 5 Complaint, recommending that it be served as to 1983 and RLUIPA claims against Wrenn, Perkins and Daly, and the other claims be dismissed. filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (Attachments:, # 1 pages 29-54)(mxm, )
January 28, 2007 NOTICE: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review and ordered the complaint to be served. Pursuant to the Agreement on Service between the Clerk of Court and New Hampshire Attorney General, this Notice constitutes service as directed by the court. The New Hampshire Attorney General shall file notice of acceptance or declination of acceptance of service within thirty (30) days. Acceptance of Service Deadline set for 2/27/2007. Answer due by 3/19/2007. (See documents 5,7,10,11 and 12)(mxm, )
January 26, 2007 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 5 Complaint, recommending that it be served as to 1983 and RLUIPA claims against Wrenn, Perkins and Daly, and the other claims be dismissed. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 2/15/2007. Signed by Judge James R. Muirhead. (mxm, )
January 26, 2007 11 Featured Case ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service. Signed by Judge James R. Muirhead. (mxm, )
October 24, 2006 10 RESPONSE re 9 Order Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint Re:Administrative Exhaustion of Remedies filed by Charles Jay Wolff. (Lynch, Daniel)
October 19, 2006 9 Featured Case ORDER plaintiff to amend complaint 5 Complaint. Amended Pleadings due by 11/20/2006. Signed by Judge James R. Muirhead. (mxm, )
September 5, 2006 IFP motion granted - case converted to a civil case. (jeb, )
September 5, 2006 8 Featured Case ORDER granting 1 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. So Ordered by Judge James R. Muirhead. (jeb, )
August 29, 2006 7 Addendum to the 5 the Complaint by Charles Jay Wolff (jeb, )
August 28, 2006 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Charles Jay Wolff (jeb, )
August 28, 2006 5 COMPLAINT against NH Department of Corrections, Gency Morse, James Daley filed by Charles Jay Wolff.(jeb, )
August 14, 2006 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT re: 1 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles Jay Wolff (jeb, )
July 10, 2006 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis with Custodial Certificate filed by Charles Jay Wolff (jeb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wolff v. NH Department of Corrections et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Daley
Represented By: Deborah B. Weissbard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Perkins
Represented By: Deborah B. Weissbard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner
Represented By: Deborah B. Weissbard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Jay Wolff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]