Markem-Imaje Corporation v. Zipher Ltd. et al

Counter Defendant: Markem Corporation and Markem-Imaje Corporation
Plaintiff: Markem-Imaje Corporation
Counter Claimant: Videojet Technologies, Inc. and Zipher Ltd.
Defendant: Videojet Technologies, Inc. and Zipher Ltd.
 
Case Number: 1:2007cv00006
Filed: January 5, 2007
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
County: Cheshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Barbadoro
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2009 110 Featured Case ///ORDER Dismissing claims and relief related to issues of willful infringement and ownership 39 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (mm)
September 1, 2009 117 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 105 Motion for Reconsideration. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (jna)
January 12, 2010 125 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 119 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (jna)
March 8, 2010 128 Featured Case ORDER in order to put the case in condition for apperal, all remaining claims are dismissed without prejudice Signed by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (mxm)
March 8, 2010 129 Featured Case ORDER on unopposed Motion for Judgment of noninfringement Signed by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (mxm)
April 23, 2012 157 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 145 Motion to Consolidate Cases. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(jna)
August 9, 2012 169 Featured Case ///ORDER granting 151 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(jna)
October 7, 2008 98 Featured Case ORDER denying 93 Motion for Reconsideration.. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (mm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Markem-Imaje Corporation v. Zipher Ltd. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Markem Corporation
Represented By: Christopher H.M. Carter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Markem-Imaje Corporation
Represented By: Christopher H.M. Carter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markem-Imaje Corporation
Represented By: Christopher H.M. Carter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Videojet Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Philip R. Braley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Zipher Ltd.
Represented By: Philip R. Braley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Videojet Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Philip R. Braley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zipher Ltd.
Represented By: Philip R. Braley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]