Transfer My Timeshare, LLC et al v. Selway et al

Plaintiff: Transfer My Timeshare, LLC, Jane Does 1-200 and John Does 1-200
Defendant: Laura Selway, Reliable Timeshare Closing Services, Inc. and Bank of America
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00118
Filed: March 28, 2008
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending Office
County: Rockingham
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2008 34 Featured Case ORDER re preliminary pretrial 10/28/08, 10 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (dae)
October 28, 2008 36 Featured Case ///ORDER approving 35 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 5 days. Case Track: Expedited. Both parties waive jury trial. Reliable Timeshare Closing Services is dismissed from the case by agreement. Affirmative defenses stricken without prejudice as outlined. Defendant to Amend Answer as ordered. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Summary Judgment Motions due by 1/28/2009. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 1/28/2009. (dae)
October 9, 2009 39 Featured Case ///ORDER granting 38 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Stipulation of Dismissal as to settlement of all other issues is due within 14 days of the date of this order, after which the clerk shall close the case. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (dae) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/13/2009: # 1 Order with Opinion Number) (dae).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Transfer My Timeshare, LLC et al v. Selway et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transfer My Timeshare, LLC
Represented By: Edwinna C. Vanderzanden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Does 1-200
Represented By: Edwinna C. Vanderzanden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Does 1-200
Represented By: Edwinna C. Vanderzanden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Selway
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliable Timeshare Closing Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]