Huard v. Essex County Correctional Center, et al

Plaintiff: Steven J. Huard
Defendant: Essex County Correctional Center, Essex County Correctional Medical Services, MA Attorney General, MA Department of Corrections, Commissioner, Essex County Sheriff, Essex County Medical Services, Director, Essex County Correctional Center, Superintendent, US Marshal, District of New Hampshire and Brad Noll
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00120
Filed: May 20, 2008
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Prisoner - Prison Condition Office
County: XX US, Outside State
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Lincoln D. Almond
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2008 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER PURSUANT TO 28 USC 1915(e): Court orders that the US Marshal serve defendants with a copy of Plaintiff's First Amended Verified Complaint and this Order. Defendants shall have twenty (20) days from the date of receipt of this Order and the accompanying documents to file an Answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Verified Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond, Sitting by Designation. (jeb)
May 21, 2009 74 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 71 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, 69 Motion to Dismiss, 51 Motion to Dismiss, recommending that Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Document Nos. 51, 69 and 71) be GRANTED. Additional ly, re: 73 , Defendant Monier's Motion for Clarification of 3/30/09 Endorsed Order Granting His Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment: Recommending that the District Court clarify that Defendant Monier's Motion to Dismiss was previously granted pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b). Follow up on Objections to R&R on 6/8/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (jeb) Modified on 5/22/2009 to add additional text regarding document 73 .(jeb).
May 21, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 44 Motion to Dismiss recommending that Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Document No. 44) be GRANTED. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 6/8/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (jeb)
June 25, 2009 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 76 Plaintiff's Motion for additional time to respond to the Reports and Recommendations. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (amm)
September 16, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER approving 74 Report and Recommendations dated May 21, 2009 by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. So Ordered by US District Judge William E Smith, Sitting by Designation. (jeb)
September 16, 2009 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER approving 75 Report and Recommendations dated May 21, 2009 by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. So Ordered by US District Judge William E Smith, Sitting by Designation. (jeb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Huard v. Essex County Correctional Center, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven J. Huard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essex County Correctional Center
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essex County Correctional Medical Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MA Attorney General
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MA Department of Corrections, Commissioner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essex County Sheriff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essex County Medical Services, Director
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essex County Correctional Center, Superintendent
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Marshal, District of New Hampshire
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Noll
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]