Nagle v. Jorgenson et al

Plaintiff: Adam H. Nagle
Defendant: FNU Jorgenson and Does 1-4
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00432
Filed: October 21, 2008
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Prisoner - Prison Condition Office
County: Merrimack
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
Referring Judge: James R. Muirhead
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2009 12 Featured Case /// ORDER approving 4 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (jab)
February 17, 2009 34 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, recommending that it be be denied. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 3/6/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (jab)
October 23, 2008 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis as to Adam H. Nagle, initial fee of plaintiff's prison account does not show any funds for an initial payment, so 20% of each preceding month's income credite d to plaintiff's account is to be remitted by the NH State Prison for Men when the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the sum of $350 has been paid. Failure to pay will result in dismissal. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (amm)
March 13, 2009 45 Featured Case ORDER approving 34 Report and Recommendations; denying 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (jab)
December 18, 2008 4 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint, recommending that plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claims alleging use of excessive force; First Amendment retaliation claims alleging denial of the right to petition the government for redress of grievances; and related state law claims alleging intentional infliction of emotional distress shall go forward; and recommending dismissal of all other remaining claims. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 1/8/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (jab)
December 18, 2008 5 Featured Case ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service upon the NH Office of the Attorney General. Clerk's Office is directed to forward summons forms to plaintiff,who must return the completed forms within 30 days of the date of this order. ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 1/20/2009.) Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (jab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Nagle v. Jorgenson et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam H. Nagle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Jorgenson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-4
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]