Chambers v. NH State Prison, Warden

Plaintiff: Randolph L. Chambers
Defendant: NH State Prison, Warden
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00442
Filed: October 28, 2008
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Prisoner - Prison Condition Office
County: Merrimack
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2009 26 Featured Case ORDER: The Clerk's Office shall unseal 16 Ex Parte Motion and 23 Ex Parte Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (cmp)
March 12, 2009 27 Featured Case ORDER directing Clerk's Office to open two new cases as to document #16 and document #24. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (cmp)
March 12, 2009 28 Featured Case ///REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint, recommending that it be dismissed in its entirety as it has failed to state any claim upon which relief might be granted. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 3/30/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (cmp)
April 9, 2009 35 Featured Case ///ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint : Chambers is a "three strike" filer who is precluded from proceeding pro se - pro se status is revoked. Recommend the complaint be dismissed without prejudice if he does not pay the $350 filing fee by 5/8/09. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 4/27/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (dae)
October 29, 2008 5 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis as to Randolph L. Chambers, initial fee of $13.00. No further action by court until initial fee paid. Failure to pay will result in dismissal. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. Fee due 11/28/2008. (amm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Chambers v. NH State Prison, Warden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph L. Chambers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH State Prison, Warden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]