Trupiano v. Cottage Hospital

Plaintiff: Thomas Trupiano
Defendant: Cottage Hospital
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00069
Filed: March 12, 2009
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Merrimack
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Barbadoro
Referring Judge: James R. Muirhead
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2009 26 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 13 Motion to Amend, 17 Motion to Amend, 1 Complaint, 22 Motion to Amend, recommending that EMTALA claim against Cottage Hospital be dismissed, and that the Court retain jurisdiction over the medial malpractice claim under 42 U.S.C. 1367(c). Follow up on Objections to R&R on 8/20/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (vln)
August 3, 2009 27 Featured Case ORDER Directing US Marshal to Make Service on Cottage Hospital. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (vln)
August 19, 2009 31 Featured Case ORDER approving 26 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (vln)
March 23, 2010 51 Featured Case ///ORDER granting 47 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (jna)
March 13, 2009 5 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis as to Thomas Trupiano, initial fee of $1.20. No further action by court until initial fee paid. Failure to pay will result in dismissal. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. Fee due 4/13/2009. (jeb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Trupiano v. Cottage Hospital
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Trupiano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cottage Hospital
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]