Chambers v. NH State Prison, Warden

Plaintiff: Randolph L. Chambers
Defendant: NH State Prison, Warden
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00092
Filed: March 13, 2009
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Prisoner - Prison Condition Office
County: Merrimack
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Barbadoro
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2008 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis as to Randolph Chambers, initial fee of $13.00. No further action by court until initial fee paid. Failure to pay will result in dismissal. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. Fee due 4/16/2009. (amm)
March 12, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, The court orders two new cases opened from documents filed in 08-cv-442-JL as they are unrelated to that action. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (amm)
March 17, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER amending 4 Order re: Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis dated 10/29/08 (originally filed as doc. no. 5 in 1:08-cv-442-JL): The informa pauperis order is amended as follows: The sum of $13.00 is due in case nos. 1:09-cv-92-PB and 1:09-cv-93-SM no later than 4/20/09. The remainder of that order shall remain in full force and effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (jeb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Chambers v. NH State Prison, Warden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph L. Chambers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH State Prison, Warden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]