Eddy v. Schofield

Plaintiff: Ronald Eddy
Defendant: Micheal Schofield
Case Number: 1:2009cv00116
Filed: March 30, 2009
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Prisoner - Prison Condition Office
County: Merrimack
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff to file on or before 7/30/09 financial affidavit and certified copy of prison trust account as outlined. Failure to file will result in dismissal of the case. ( Notice of Compliance Deadline set for 7/30/2009.) Signed by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
July 22, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 14 Affidavit in support of proceeding on an In Forma Pauperis basis. ( Initial Fee of $3.40 due 8/13/2009 with payment schedule as outlined.) Failure to pay initial partial filing fee will result in dismissal of the action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
August 18, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER terminating 6 Motion to Clarify; case is dismissed without prejudice for failure to pay the initial filing fee. Clerk to enter judgment and close the case. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
April 7, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis as to Ronald Eddy, initial fee of $8.60. No further action by court until initial fee paid. Failure to pay will result in dismissal. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. Fee due 5/6/2009. (jeb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eddy v. Schofield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Eddy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheal Schofield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]