Jutras v. Graham

Plaintiff: David Emile Jutras
Defendant: Dorothy E. Graham
Case Number: 1:2009cv00151
Filed: April 29, 2009
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
County: Coos
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Barbadoro
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 7 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (mm)
May 5, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis as to David Emile Jutras, initial fee of $14.60. No further action by court until initial fee paid. Failure to pay will result in dismissal. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. Fee due 6/9/2009. (jeb)
May 7, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIMITING REMOTE ELECTRONIC AND PUBLIC ACCESS re: 4 Addendum #1 to 1 Complaint: Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (jeb)
June 8, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint, recommending that it be dismissed in its entirety. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 6/25/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (mxm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jutras v. Graham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Emile Jutras
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy E. Graham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]