Gonzalez v. Rockingham County Department of Corrections, Superintendent

Plaintiff: Geraldo Gonzalez
Defendant: Rockingham County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00234
Filed: July 24, 2009
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
County: Rockingham
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
Referring Judge: James R. Muirhead
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2009 10 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 5 Motion to Amend (Addendum to complaint) and 1 Complaint, recommending that Service be made on claim as outlined; Remaining claims to be dismissed. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 9/28/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (dae)
September 10, 2009 11 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re Request for Preliminary Injunction - Documents 1 Complaint and 5 Addenda: recommending that an injunction be issued as outlined. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 9/28/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (dae)
September 10, 2009 12 Featured Case ORDER. Clerk's Office to forward Gonzalez a blank summons form; Gonzalez to complete and return to Clerk's Office within 30 days. Clerk's Office to then issue the summons and forward to US Marshal for service. Defendant to answer within 20 days of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (dae)
October 14, 2009 15 Featured Case ///ORDER approving 10 Report and Recommendations as to Complaint; approving 11 Report and Recommendations as to injunction. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
November 23, 2009 27 Featured Case ORDER - canceling telephone pretrial conference scheduled for 12/10/09. Discovery Plans to be filed by 12/18/09. (Follow up on Discovery Plan 12/18/2009.) Signed by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Discovery Plan)(dae)
December 8, 2009 31 Featured Case ORDER denying 21 Motion to Strike Doc. 20 Answer to Complaint (Defendant's October 30, 2009 Pleadings) ; granting in part to the extent that a demand for damages in the amount of $3,5000,000 is added to his complaint and otherwise denying 23 Motion to Amend/Supplement Complaint. Plaintiff's complaint is not amended to add a claim for breach of fiduciary duty. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
August 30, 2010 41 Featured Case ///ORDER granting 39 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (gla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Rockingham County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldo Gonzalez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockingham County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]