Picard v. Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Medical Department

Plaintiff: Warren Picard
Defendant: Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Medical Department
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00271
Filed: August 10, 2009
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
County: Hillsborough
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
Referring Judge: James R. Muirhead
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2010 24 Featured Case ORDER re plaintiff's change of address. A copy of the pending summary judgment will be mailed to plaintiff's new address and he shall respond within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (vln)
December 9, 2010 36 Featured Case ///ORDER granting 22 defendants' motion for summary judgment; and denying as moot 28 Picard's motion for protective order. So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (lag)
August 7, 2009 3 Featured Case COPY OF ORDER (entered in 1:09-cv-259-PB): Plaintiff has filed two complaint documents that, because they were filed together, were filed as a single action in 1:09-cv-259-PB. Upon review of the file, it is readily apparent that Picard intended to file two actions. The Clerk's Office is order to: Open a new case for the second action, the complaint for which is comprised of pages 15-21 of doc. no. 1 in 1:09-cv-259-PB; in the newly opened case, docket the in forma paupe ris, filings and orders thereon that have previously been filed in the first case; docket copy of this order in the newly opened case; forward new case, once opened, immediately to the undersigned for preliminary review. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (jeb)
November 20, 2009 4 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint, recommending that the Jane Doe Nurse Supervisor and the HCDOC Medical Department be dismissed, the plaintiff's inadequate medical care and inadequate diet claims proceed against defendant O'Mara, and that the Clerk's Office will effect service on the nurses once plaintiff identifies them by name. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 12/10/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (jab)
November 20, 2009 5 Featured Case ORDER Directing US Marshal to Make Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (jab)
December 16, 2009 6 Featured Case /// ORDER approving 4 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (jab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Picard v. Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Medical Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Picard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Medical Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]