Frost et al v. Hampton, Town of et al

Plaintiff: Mark Frost and Jayson Gardner
Defendant: Hampton, Town of, Matthew Kulesz and Joseph Galvin
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00339
Filed: October 7, 2009
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
County: Strafford
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Referring Judge:
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2010 22 Featured Case ORDER re Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for January 22, 2010. Signed by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (dae)
March 4, 2010 26 Featured Case PERMANENT INJUNCTION as outlined. Signed by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (dae)
April 23, 2010 32 Featured Case ORDER granting in part 27 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. The defendant Town of Hampton shall forthwith remit $34,005.00 in attorneys' fees and $852.10 in costs to the plaintiffs, via their counsel. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
November 19, 2009 9 Featured Case PROCEDURAL ORDER: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING: Exhibit and Witness List due by 11/24/2009, 2 PM. Notice of Compliance Deadline set for 11/23/2009, 5 pm for parties to jointly file timeline and statement of agreed facts. Proposed findings of fact and rulings of law and plaintiff's proposed order per LR 65.1 by 11/24/2009, 2 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Frost et al v. Hampton, Town of et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Frost
Represented By: Michael J. Tierney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayson Gardner
Represented By: Michael J. Tierney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hampton, Town of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Kulesz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Galvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]