Levesque v. State of New Hampshire, et al

 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00437
Filed: January 21, 2010
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Referring Judge: James R. Muirhead
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2010 22 Featured Case ORDER Directing US Marshal to Make Service.Certain Pleadings to be re-docketed as addenda to the complaint as outlined. As to claims against Eppolito, Sylvester and the MCHC, Clerk's Office to complete summons forms, issu e and forward to US Marshal for service. Defendants to answer within 20 days. As to claims against SPU and Steven, Clerk's Office directed to serve the NH AG as provided in Agreement on Acceptance of Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (cmp)
May 17, 2010 23 Featured Case ORDER directing Clerk's Office to add defendants Eppolito, Sylvester and Merrimack County House of Corrections as parties to this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (cmp)
May 19, 2010 24 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER directing Clerk's Office to add further defendants, SPU and Stevenson in addition to Eppolito, Sylvester and Merrimack County House of Corrections as parties to this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (cmp)
June 14, 2010 35 Featured Case ///ORDER approving 21 Report and Recommendations. The following cases shall be consolidated in the main case (09cv437-JL)and shall be statistically closed: Civil No. 09-cv-248-JD, Civil No. 09-cv-418-SM, Civil No. 09-cv-419-P B, Civil No. 09-cv-427-PB, Civil No. 09-cv-429-PB, Civil No. 09-cv-430-SM, Civil No. 09-cv-434-PB, Civil No. 09-cv-435-SM, Civil No. 09-cv-437-JL, Civil No. 09-cv-438-SM, Civil No. 09-cv-453-JD, Civil No. 10-cv-040-SM, Civil No. 10-cv-049-PB. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (cmp)
July 1, 2010 49 Featured Case ORDER granting Motion to Amend Complaint 30 and 31 and Directing Clerk's Office to Issue Summonses and forward to the US Marshal to Make Service on Judy Figueroa, Nancy Gallagher, Emily Wyman, Capt. Ward, andCapt. Hague at the Merrimack County House of Corrections. Signed by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (cmp)
September 8, 2010 80 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion for Protective Order. Levesque is directed not to file any further frivolous or repetitive pleadings. Defendants are not required to file any responsive pleading to any fi ling by Levesque unless directed to do so by the court. Defendants' request to enjoin Levesque from filing any further amendment to his complaint is DENIED without prejudice to renewal of the motion if appropriate in the future. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
September 8, 2010 81 Featured Case ORDER granting 59 Motion to Revoke In Forma Pauperis Status. Levesque must pay the entire filing fee within 30 days of this order. Failure to pay will result in case being dismissed without prejudice to refiling. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
December 1, 2010 88 Featured Case ORDER denying 37 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk's Office is directed to complete summons forms and issue the summons and copies of the documents as outlined to the U.S. Marshal's Office as described in this Order. The U.S. Marshal's Office is directed to make service on Dr. John Eppolito as described in this Order. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
June 30, 2011 96 Featured Case ORDER denying 95 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff must comply with this order as outlined within 45 days. Plaintiff's failure to comply with all future deadlines and orders, as well as the procedural obligations inherent in prosecuting this case, may result in dismissal of the lawsuit. The Preliminary Pretrial Conference, currently set for July 13, 2011, at 10:00 a.m., will be continued. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (cmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Levesque v. State of New Hampshire, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]