Coach, Inc. et al v. Gata Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Coach Services, Inc. and Coach, Inc.
Defendant: John Does 1- 20, Gata Corporation and Martin Taylor
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00141
Filed: April 15, 2010
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: James R. Muirhead
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2010 17 Featured Case ORDER approving, as amended, 13 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 5 days. Case Track: Standard. Ready for Trial on 7/19/2011. Summary Judgment Motions due by 2/14/2011. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 10/18/2010. Discovery deadline 1/17/2011. Mediation Follow Up on 1/17/2011. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (kad)
January 20, 2011 25 Featured Case ORDER granting 21 Motion to Exceed Default Deposition Limitations of Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(a)(2)(A)(i) and For Modification of the Court's Discovery Plan Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (gla)
January 20, 2011 26 Featured Case ORDER granting 19 Motion to Compel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (gla)
March 16, 2011 41 Featured Case ORDER granting 27 Motion to Compel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (gla)
March 17, 2011 42 Featured Case ORDER granting in part 30 Motion for Contempt. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (gla)
April 29, 2011 54 Featured Case ORDER re: 48 status report for additional production of documents in conjunction with 19 Motion to Compel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (ko)
June 9, 2011 69 Featured Case ORDER granting 57 Motion for Reconsideration re: 52 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. The court grants defendants' motion for reconsideration (doc. no. 57), but only to the extent allowing defendants to withdraw and amend their answers to Coach's requests for admissions. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (gla)
June 21, 2011 72 Featured Case ORDER re: June 15, 2011 Telephone Conference. The trial is continued to the two-week period beginning October 18, 2011. The final pretrial conference is scheduled for October 7, 2011, at 11:00 a.m. The parties are ordered to a ppear on July 12, 2011, at 11:00 a.m. for a settlement conference. A hearing on plaintiff's pending contempt motion (doc. no. 64) is scheduled for 10:30 a.m. on July 12, 2011. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (kad)
July 12, 2011 78 Featured Case ORDER. Martin Taylor, Gata Corporation, and any entity owned or controlled by either or both of them ("the defendants") are hereby enjoined from transferring any real or personal property currently owned by any of the m, other than in the ordinary course of business. Within five days of this order, defendants shall provide to counsel for Coach a detailed accounting of all assets held by defendants. The parties shall notify the Clerk of Court if they believe furt her mediation may be productive. An evidentiary hearing on the Motion for Attachment (doc. no. 59) shall occur during the week of August 1, 2011. Any further settlement conference shall be scheduled to occur on the samedate. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (kad)
July 21, 2011 87 Featured Case ORDER granting 73 Motion for Discovery regarding the Sufficiency of Defendants' Answers to Requests for Admissions. Defendants shall have ten days from the date of this order to serve amended answers to each of the nineteen requests identified. If, however, defendants fail to do so, then the matters in each of those requests shall be deemed admitted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (kad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Coach, Inc. et al v. Gata Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coach Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Martin Malone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coach, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Martin Malone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1- 20
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gata Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]