USA v. J.A. Greenwood Roofing

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: J.A. Greenwood Roofing
Case Number: 1:2010cv00590
Filed: December 21, 2010
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Occup. Safety
Cause of Action: 29:651 Occupational Safety/Health
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER John Greenwood is directed to show cause why the court should not require defendant to be represented by counsel in this matter. Mr. Greenwood must file a notice in this court, within ten days of the date of this order, st ating the nature of the business entity J.A. Greenwood Roofing. Specifically, Mr. Greenwood must state whether J.A. Greenwood Roofing is a sole proprietorship, or whether it is an unincorporated association or trust, so the court can determine whether LR 83.6(c) applies to require defendant to be represented by counsel in this action.SO ORDERED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (ko)
June 6, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The defendant is responsible to assure counsel files an appearance on its behalf within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order. If no response is filed, the court will impose an appropriate sanction, which may include the entry of default pursuant to Local Rule 1.3(a). See also Fed. R. Civ. P. 55. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (ko)
August 1, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion for Final Order of Continuing Garnishment. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch.(ko)
March 24, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Court is not persuaded that plaintiff has made adequate service of process on defendant. On or before 4/14/2011, plaintiff to file sufficient proof to show that the individual served with the complaint is the proper recip ient of service for defendant under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The court vacates order of 2/17/11 (doc. no. 7). Once the record is clarified as to the nature of the business entity sued, and the adequacy of service of process, the court will e xamine the applicability of Local Rule 83.6(c) to determine whether Mr. Greenwood may answer pro se for defendant in this matter or whether counsel must appear for defendant. Vacating 7 Order Directing Appearance on behalf of business. ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 4/14/2011.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (amm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. J.A. Greenwood Roofing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.A. Greenwood Roofing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]