Hart v. NH State Prison

Notice Only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only) and NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Defendant: NH State Prison
Plaintiff: Kenneth H. Hart
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00002
Filed: January 3, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2011 18 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 8 Motion for Court to order the defendants to return pro se privilege files; denying as moot 9 Motion for copy of docket sheets, paper supplies, process receipt and return forms, 1983 and 2254 forms, se lf-addressed stamped envelopes, etc.; denying as moot 10 Emergency Motion for Cease and Desist Order ; denying as moot 11 Motion for an Emergency Order - for Lt. Cascio to return property ; denying as moot 12 Motion directing the defendants and Lt Cascio to respect his attorney-client-privilege, etc. ; approving 13 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
April 19, 2011 22 Featured Case ORDER granting to extent as outlined and otherwise denied 20 Motion for findings of fact and ruling of law. Plaintiff to file motion for IFP with required materials by 5/10/11. If a properly supported motion is received and granted, case will be reopened. If plaintiff fails to file a properly supported motion or if a motion is filed but not granted, case will not be reopened. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
May 17, 2011 24 Featured Case ORDER denying 23 Motion for Further Extension of Time to pay the filing fee. Case remains closed. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
September 19, 2011 28 Featured Case ORDER approving 26 Report and Recommendations; denying 25 Motion to Reopen Case. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
January 13, 2011 6 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 5 Motion for the court to return filed papers. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (amm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hart v. NH State Prison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH State Prison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth H. Hart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]