W. B. v. MWV Healthcare Assoc., Inc. et al

Defendant: Memorial Hospital, M. Angus Badger, Rita Kostecke and MWV Healthcare Assoc., Inc.
Plaintiff: Doreen W.B.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00036
Filed: January 27, 2011
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for August 22, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
April 5, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 29 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Medical Expenses Not Paid by Plaintiff or Any Other Source; granting 30 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence, Testimony or Other Matters Relative to Neuropsychological Injury. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
May 8, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 42 Supplemental Motion for David P. Slawsky to Withdraw as Attorney. Plaintiff to file pro se response as outlined on or before May 15, 2013. Case removed from the July trial calendar. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
May 20, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 40 Motion for David P. Slawsky to Withdraw as Attorney; granting 41 Emergency Motion for Daniel R. Sonneborn and Alan B. Rindler to Withdraw as Attorney. Case stayed for 45 days pending plaintiff's response as outlined. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: W. B. v. MWV Healthcare Assoc., Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Peter A. Meyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Angus Badger
Represented By: Peter A. Meyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita Kostecke
Represented By: Peter A. Meyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MWV Healthcare Assoc., Inc.
Represented By: Peter A. Meyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreen W.B.
Represented By: David P. Slawsky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]