CADIM Note Inc. v. Southern New Hampshire Hospitality, LLC et al

Third Party Defendant: CWCapital LLC and DBD OTLP LLC
Receiver: Crescent Hotels & Resorts, LLC
Defendant: Southern New Hampshire Hospitality, LLC, Anthony Dilorenzo and Kevin Bowden
Counter Claimant: Southern New Hampshire Hospitality, LLC and Anthony Dilorenzo
Third Party Plaintiff: Anthony Dilorenzo and Southern New Hampshire Hospitality, LLC
Plaintiff: DBD OTLP LLC and CADIM Note Inc.
Counter Defendant: CADIM Note Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00044
Filed: January 31, 2011
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2012 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 109 Motion Approve Order Requiring Compliance With Receiver Order; granting 112 Motion Late Entry of Reply. Accounting due by 4/2/12. Responses as outlined. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
April 11, 2012 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER PERTAINING TO FINAL ACCOUNTING OF RECEIVER, CRESCENT HOTELS & RESORTS. The Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
August 6, 2012 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING FINAL ACCOUNTING AND DISCHARGING RECEIVER AFP102 CORP. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
February 17, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court APPROVED ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER. Signed by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (cmp)
April 11, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court APPROVED ORDER REGARDING EXPEDITED MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (cmp)
June 6, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING RECEIVER'S ENGAGING OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (cmp)
July 7, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for July 11, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
July 11, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER and Order granting 58 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (cmp)
October 7, 2011 97 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN ORDER denying without prejudice 92 Motion for Default Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CADIM Note Inc. v. Southern New Hampshire Hospitality, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party defendant: CWCapital LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party defendant: DBD OTLP LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Crescent Hotels & Resorts, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern New Hampshire Hospitality, LLC
Represented By: Jason A. Manekas
Represented By: Peter B. McGlynn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Dilorenzo
Represented By: Jason A. Manekas
Represented By: Peter B. McGlynn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Bowden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Southern New Hampshire Hospitality, LLC
Represented By: Jason A. Manekas
Represented By: Peter B. McGlynn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Anthony Dilorenzo
Represented By: Jason A. Manekas
Represented By: Peter B. McGlynn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party plaintiff: Anthony Dilorenzo
Represented By: Jason A. Manekas
Represented By: Peter B. McGlynn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party plaintiff: Southern New Hampshire Hospitality, LLC
Represented By: Jason A. Manekas
Represented By: Peter B. McGlynn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DBD OTLP LLC
Represented By: Peter S. Cowan
Represented By: John H. Perten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CADIM Note Inc.
Represented By: Armando E. Batastini
Represented By: Brian D. Duffy
Represented By: Gordon J. MacDonald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: CADIM Note Inc.
Represented By: Gordon J. MacDonald
Represented By: Brian D. Duffy
Represented By: Armando E. Batastini
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]