Gebo v. Thyng

Notice Only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only) and NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Plaintiff: John W. Gebo
Defendant: Robert Thyng
Case Number: 1:2011cv00047
Filed: February 18, 2011
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Clerk to make service on NH Office of Attorney General as provided in the Agreement on Acceptance of Service. Defendant to answer within 20 days of acceptance of service. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (dae)
August 2, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER conditionally granting - on the condition that suitable counsel may be identified and is available and willing to take this matter on a pro bono basis re: 10 Motion to Appoint Counsel. If the Court is unable to secure counsel by 8/31/11, Gebo to receive prompt notice thereof. Deadline for response to R&R extended to 9/15/11. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (dae)
September 26, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER approving 14 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
January 18, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 25 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant afforded opportunity to file Motion for summary judgment on or before 1/31/12. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
March 21, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part as provided for in the order 37 Motion to Strike Affidavit of David Peters; hearing to be scheduled on 35 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
June 7, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
October 11, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(lt)
February 22, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. IFP Consent Form due 3/18/2011. (jeb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gebo v. Thyng
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W. Gebo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Thyng
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]