Defrias v. Koeppel

Plaintiff: Lisa Defrias
Unknown: David A. Sullivan
Defendant: Fritz Koeppel
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00080
Filed: February 25, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference set for June 2, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
June 30, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 21 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 3-4 days. Case Track: Standard. Affirmative defenses #3 (third party), #4 (release) and #5 (waiver and release) stricken without prejudice. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Summary Judgment Motions due by 4/16/2012. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 1/5/2012. Mediation Follow Up on 12/5/2011. (dae)
April 18, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing with prejudice the case pursuant to LR 41.1. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Defrias v. Koeppel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Defrias
Represented By: Shawn J. Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: David A. Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fritz Koeppel
Represented By: Adam G. Cohen
Represented By: Amy J. Vesely
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]