Bedard v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., et al

Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kimberly A. Ruff Bedard
Case Number: 1:2011cv00117
Filed: March 15, 2011
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion to Remand to State Court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
June 9, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for June 16, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
June 20, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 16 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 1 - 2 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Plaintiff to file Amended Complaint by 8/1/11; answers due in accordance with Federal Rules. Summary Judgment Motions due by 11/16/2011. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 7/15/2011. Mediation Follow Up on 1/30/2012. (dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bedard v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Paula-Lee Chambers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Paula-Lee Chambers
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Coan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Coan
Represented By: Paula-Lee Chambers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly A. Ruff Bedard
Represented By: John P. Kalled
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]