Kargbo v. Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Superintendent

Defendant: Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Plaintiff: Abu B. Kargbo
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00130
Filed: March 31, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2011 16 Featured Case ORDER Directing US Marshal to Make Service - the clerk's office is directed to prepare/issue summonses for Sgt. Brown and Officers Meurin, Plumpton and Caisse, and forward to the US Marshal's Office (summonses, complai nt (doc nos. 1, 8, 9, and 12), the Report and Recommendation and this Order for service on each defendant; granting 9 Motion to Amend ; and denying without prejudice 10 Motion to Appoint Counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(cmp)
January 5, 2012 19 Featured Case ORDER re: 18 US Marshal Return, Summons Returned Unexecuted re: FNU Meurin. ( Notice of Compliance Deadline set for 4/5/2012.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jab)
January 23, 2012 27 Featured Case ///ORDER approving 15 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(vln) Modified on 1/23/2012 to add: ///(vln).
January 31, 2012 29 Featured Case ORDER Directing US Marshal to Make Service; denying 24 MOTION for Service Upopn Attorney Kirby. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(vln) Modified on 2/1/2012 to add "denying 24" (vln).
February 28, 2012 34 Featured Case ORDER approving 28 Report and Recommendations. All claims asserted as to Sgt. FNU Antilles and Officers Adam, J. Barbera, Boil, Crow, Davis, Ellis, Fitzpatrick, Medic, Michaud, Price, Richard, and Ross are dismissed. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(vln)
April 13, 2012 44 Featured Case ORDER approving 37 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 3 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Summary Judgment Motions due by 1/15/2013. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 7/11/2012. Mediation Follow Up on 4/15/2013.(vln)
June 4, 2012 46 Featured Case ///ORDER approving 45 Report and Recommendations. The action against Officer Meurin is dismissed without prejudice. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(vln)
August 15, 2012 54 Featured Case ORDER 52 Statement Regarding Discovery Matters ( Response deadline set for 9/4/2012). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(vln)
October 11, 2012 58 Featured Case ORDER granting 50 Motion to Appoint Counsel, conditioned on the identification of suitable, available counsel willing to represent Kargbo pro bono by 11/8/12. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
October 11, 2012 59 Featured Case ORDER granting 57 Motion to Seal Document at Level II. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
April 4, 2011 5 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Financial Affidavit filed by Abu B. Kargbo. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. IFP Consent Form due 4/28/2011. (jeb)
November 15, 2012 69 Featured Case ORDER 58 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. Attorney David Ruoff has agreed to accept the pro bono appointment and shall represent the plaintiff, Abu B. Kargbo. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(vln)
December 13, 2013 96 Featured Case ///ORDER granting in part and denying in part 85 defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting 87 defendants' Motion to Strike Kargbo's deposition errata sheet. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lat)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kargbo v. Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abu B. Kargbo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]