Hersey v. WPB Partners, LLC

Defendant: WPB Partners, LLC
Plaintiff: Mary Hersey
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00207
Filed: April 29, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 27 NOTICE of Suggestion of Bankruptcy. So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
December 5, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: By operation of the provisions of 11 U.S.C. § 362, defendants counterclaim is automatically stayed; granting 29 Attorney Somma's Notice of Attorney Withdrawal, and the bankruptcy trustee in plaintiff's bankruptcy case shall file a motion for substitution of party pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 17, on or before 1/13/2012. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
January 18, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing plaintiff's claims for failure to prosecute re: 30 Order and administratively closing case. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
July 24, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting in part and denying in part 42 defendant's Motion to Dismiss. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lat)
February 11, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting 52 defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting 53 defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lat)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hersey v. WPB Partners, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WPB Partners, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Somma
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Hersey
Represented By: Lexie Rojas
Represented By: Christopher J. Seufert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]