Ojo v. Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Superintendent et al

Plaintiff: Osahenrumwen Ojo
Defendant: Liz Descar and Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00210
Filed: May 2, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion for Waiver of Service of Summons. Order directs US Marshal to Make Service. Defendant to answer within 21 days of service. Document #10 to be redocketed as an addendum to the complaint. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(dae)
January 10, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER approving 20 Report and Recommendations; the complaint is dismissed as to all claims and all defendants with the exception of an excessive force claim against defendants Medic and Goulding. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(dae)
May 3, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 30 Motion to Compel and 31 Objection to Motion/Request for Extension. Set ddls re: 30 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Request for Admission. Follow up on Further Response on 5/15/2012; Reply on 5/29/2012. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(dae)
May 2, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial filing fee waived, 20% of account exceeding $10 to be paid until sum of $350 is submitted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. IFP Consent Form due 5/26/2011. (amm) Modified on 5/3/2011 to add: initial fee waived (amm).
June 14, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER limiting remote access to attachments to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 41 as they contain one or more personal identifiers listed in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2(a). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(dae)
August 29, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 52 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(dae)
October 1, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 55 Motion to Dismiss. Motion converted to a Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants have 14 days to file additional materials. Plaintiff will have 30 days thereafter to respond. Defendants may file a Reply and Plaintiff may seek to file a Surreply. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(dae)
October 1, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice to refiling if the recommendation is not approved 51 Motion for Leave to File Goulding's and Medic's Signature affidavits. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(dae)
October 15, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 30 Motion to Compel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
October 29, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Prohibiting Remote Electronic Access to Attachments 5-9 of Document 67 Plaintiff's Objection to Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch.(dae)
November 4, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 59 Report and Recommendation; denying 40 and 41 Motions for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(dae)
February 14, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 78 Report and Recommendation: denying 55 and 64 Motions for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ojo v. Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Superintendent et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osahenrumwen Ojo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liz Descar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]