Young et al v. The Hartford Insurance Company

Counter Defendant: Benjamin Young and Kathy Young
Plaintiff: Benjamin Young and Kathy Young
Counter Claimant: The Hartford Insurance Company
Defendant: The Hartford Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2011cv00240
Filed: May 11, 2011
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference set for June 29, 2011 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
June 29, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion to Remand; approving 12 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 2 - 4 days. Case Track: Expedited Summary Judgment Motions due by 10/31/2011. Mediation Follow Up on 1/2/2012. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (dae)
March 16, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting 14 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 20 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Hartford's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED, the Young's cross-motion for summary judge is DENIED, and the clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young et al v. The Hartford Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Benjamin Young
Represented By: R. Peter Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Kathy Young
Represented By: R. Peter Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Young
Represented By: R. Peter Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Young
Represented By: R. Peter Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: The Hartford Insurance Company
Represented By: Harvey Weiner
Represented By: Robert A. McCall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert A. McCall
Represented By: Harvey Weiner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]