National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA v. NGM Insurance Company et al

Defendant: NGM Insurance Company and Cody A. Wenzel
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00303
Filed: June 23, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 1, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion to Consolidate Cases. 11cv303-JD and 11cv335-JD are consolidated into one case. 11cv335-JD is statistically closed. Case 11cv327-JL and 11cv335-JD are not consolidated. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
October 4, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 15 Discovery Plan. As to Summary Adjudication Phase: Motions for summary judgment due 10/12/11; objections 10/28/11; reply 11/14/11. Discovery Phase (applicable only in event the court is unable to resol ve case at summary judgment); Discovery expedited track; proposed discovery plan no later than 14 days and trial approx 120 days after ruling on motion for summary judgment. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Summary Judgment Motions due by 10/12/2011.(dae)
November 14, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 28 Motion to Strike Affidavit in support of Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
December 21, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting in part and denying in part 20 National Union's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 25 NGM's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 31 Wenzel's Motion for Joind er in NGM's Motion for Summary Judgment. National Union shall provide primary coverage, and NGM shallprovide excess coverage to Brookfield in the underlying suit, 11cv327. NGM has no duty to provide a defense. Clerk to enter judgment and close cases. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA v. NGM Insurance Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NGM Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody A. Wenzel
Represented By: Christopher E. Grant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Alexander G. Henlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]