Bullen et al v. Bank of America, N.A., et al.

Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association, BAC Home Loans Servicing LP and Bank of America, N.A.
Unknown: John L. McGowan
Plaintiff: Christine Bullen and Clyde Bullen
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00309
Filed: June 27, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER re: 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Notice of Compliance Deadline for parties to jointly file timeline and statement of facts set for 8/25/2011, 5 PM. Exhibit and Witness Lists and Proposed Findings of Fact and Rulings of Law due by 8/26/2011, 5 PM. On or before 10 AM 8/29/11, plaintiff to file proposed order as outlined. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (dae)
August 24, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for August 29, 2011 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
September 20, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 18 Discovery Plan; complaint amended as outlined. Length of Trial 1-2 Days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Summary Judgment Motions due by 3/30/2012. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 9/30/2011. Settlement is likely.(dae)
October 5, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Case stayed to 10/26/12; Trial is postponed until June 2013. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bullen et al v. Bank of America, N.A., et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Jill K. Hauff
Represented By: Mark E. Porada
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing LP
Represented By: Mark E. Porada
Represented By: Jill K. Hauff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Jill K. Hauff
Represented By: Mark E. Porada
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: John L. McGowan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Bullen
Represented By: Keriann Roman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde Bullen
Represented By: Keriann Roman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]