Associated Merchandise Group, Inc. et al v. American Marketing and Capital, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Associated Merchandise Group, Inc., Cool Comfort Technologies, Inc. and Digital Dye, Inc.
Defendant: CCT Lending, LLC and American Marketing and Capital, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00311
Filed: June 27, 2011
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(mxm)
November 14, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 28 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 29 Motion for Leave to File reply.; denying as moot 16 Motion to Dismiss; granting 18 Motion for jurisdictional discovery. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)
May 3, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER discharging security So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)
May 22, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for final judgment So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Associated Merchandise Group, Inc. et al v. American Marketing and Capital, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Associated Merchandise Group, Inc.
Represented By: Anna B. Hantz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cool Comfort Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Anna B. Hantz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Digital Dye, Inc.
Represented By: Anna B. Hantz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCT Lending, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Marketing and Capital, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]