Walker et al v. Segway, Inc.

Defendant: Segway, Inc.
Plaintiff: Charles W. Walker, Jr. and Janette Walker
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00382
Filed: August 3, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER re: 16 Sealed Motion to Compel, 17 Sealed Addendum, 21 Sealed Opposition, 24 Sealed Reply, and 27 Sealed Order. Within 10 days of the date of this order, parties to file memo to show cause why these documents should not be unsealed. Notice of Compliance Deadline set for 5/2/2013. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
May 15, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER unsealing documents 16, 17, 21, 24 and 27. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
June 18, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER denying 29 Motion to Extend Time to file Motion for Reconsideration; denying 35 Motion for Reconsideration of 27 Order. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
July 15, 2013 45 Featured Case ORDER granting 31 Motion for Fees and Expenses. Defendant shall pay $21,830.70 to the plaintiffs. Document #31 is unsealed. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Walker et al v. Segway, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Segway, Inc.
Represented By: Ralph Suozzo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles W. Walker, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew B. Livernois
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janette Walker
Represented By: Andrew B. Livernois
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]