Esposito et al v SDB Investments, Inc.

Plaintiff: Gary Esposito and Dawn Esposito
Defendant: SDB Investments, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00402
Filed: August 15, 2011
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 9 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 2-3 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Mediation Follow Up on 4/23/2012.(cmp) Modified on 10/26/2011 to add:Date signed 10/24/11 (cmp).
June 26, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Jury Selection. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
July 2, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Motion for a View; granting 19 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Subsequent Remedial Measures. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
October 17, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for October 24, 2011 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Esposito et al v SDB Investments, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Esposito
Represented By: Stephen E. Borofsky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Esposito
Represented By: Stephen E. Borofsky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SDB Investments, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]