Chagnon v. US Department of Veterans Affairs, Secretary

Defendant: US Department of Veterans Affairs, Secretary
Plaintiff: John F. Chagnon
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00461
Filed: September 29, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 38:2011 - Veteran's Readjustment Assistance Act of
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER approving 3 Report and Recommendations; denying 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; approving 12 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
April 25, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 16 Notice of Appeal to Magistrate Judge consolidation ruling of 4/3/12: to the extent plaintiff intended for this to be an objection to the Order, that motion is denied; granting 17 Motion to Extend Time to Appeal - plaintiff has until 5/23/12 to file a Notice of Appeal. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
January 31, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court Potential CONSOLIDATION ORDER re: Cases 11cv461-JD, 11cv474-PB. Unless parties object within 14 days, these cases will be consolidated and an order of consolidation issued. ( Response deadline set for 2/14/2012.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(dae)
February 15, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 5 Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond re 3 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Follow up on Objection on 4/2/2012.(gla)
March 7, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 7 Response to Order re Potential Consolidation. Exhibits to Doc. 7 contain one or more personal identifiers. Clerk to limit remote access. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Chagnon v. US Department of Veterans Affairs, Secretary
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Veterans Affairs, Secretary
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John F. Chagnon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]