Chagnon v. Concepcion et al

Defendant: Abner Concepcion and US Department of Veterans Affairs, Secretary
Plaintiff: John F. Chagnon
Case Number: 1:2011cv00474
Filed: October 11, 2011
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Barbadoro
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 38:2011 - Veteran's Readjustment Assistance Act of
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Potential Consolidation (cases 11cv561-JD and 11cv474-PB) Unless the parties file an objection within 14 days of the date of this order, these cases will be consolidated and an order of consolidation issued. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(mm)
February 14, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond re 11 Report and Recommendations/Order Directing Service, 10 Order of potentional consolidation.. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Follow up on Objection on 3/30/2012.(mxm)
March 7, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: exhibits in 14 Response to Order re: Potential consolidation. Clerk to limit remote access So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(mm)
November 16, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to assist the court in its preliminary review and considering the motion for preliminary injunction, the defendants, within 30 days, to file a brief 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 1 Complaint. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(mm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chagnon v. Concepcion et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abner Concepcion
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Veterans Affairs, Secretary
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John F. Chagnon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]