Knapp v. Kench et al

Notice Only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only) and NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Defendant: James Daly, Richard Gerry and Chris Kench
Plaintiff: John Knapp
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00491
Filed: October 21, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Barbadoro
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service on the New Hampshire Attorney General as provided in the Agreement on Acceptance of Service. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(mm)
June 6, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER approving 14 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)
June 12, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER conditionally granting 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(mm)
July 16, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing Attorney Karyl Martin to represent John Knapp So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch.(mm)
October 24, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. IFP Consent Form due 11/17/2011.(amm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Knapp v. Kench et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Daly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Gerry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Kench
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Knapp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]