McCarvill v. Fahey

Defendant: Michael R. Fahey
Plaintiff: Kathleen J. McCarvill
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00530
Filed: November 16, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER re 13 Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff to file memorandum as outlined by January 5, 2012. Defendant's time to respond to amended motion for preliminary injunction stayed. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
January 12, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for January 19, 2012 at 11:30 a.m. before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
January 19, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving as outlined 17 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 3 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Summary Judgment Motions due by 9/7/2012. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 10/5/2012. Mediation Follow Up on 7/2/2012.(dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McCarvill v. Fahey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Fahey
Represented By: Debbie Lorusso Makris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen J. McCarvill
Represented By: Clara Ann Dietel
Represented By: Paul R. Kfoury, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]