L'Esperance v. HSBC Consumer Lending, Inc. et al

Defendant: Household International, Inc., Manhattan Mortgage Corporation, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Group, HSBC Consumer Lending, Inc. and Beneficial Corporation
Plaintiff: Linda L'Esperance
Case Number: 1:2011cv00555
Filed: November 30, 2011
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting 5 Motion to Dismiss. HSBC Lending's motion to dismiss is granted, but without prejudice to L'Esperance's filing an amended complaint. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
February 2, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF RULING 11 Order on Motion to Dismiss. In the event plaintiff elects to file an amended complaint, the complaint shall be filed on or before March 2, 2012. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Amended Pleadings due by 3/2/2012.(kad)
June 12, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting in part 24 Motion to Dismiss; granting 25 Motion to Dismiss; denying 30 Motion for Leave to File. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
September 5, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER denying 34 Motion for Default Judgment as to Manhattan Mortgage Corporation. Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L'Esperance v. HSBC Consumer Lending, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Household International, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manhattan Mortgage Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Finance Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Group
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Consumer Lending, Inc.
Represented By: Jason D. Gregoire
Represented By: Michael R. Stanley
Represented By: John-Mark Turner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beneficial Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda L'Esperance
Represented By: Shenanne Ruth Tucker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]