Gaskill v. NH State Prison

Notice Only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only) and NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Defendant: NH State Prison
Plaintiff: Michael Gaskill
 
Case Number: 1:2011fp00274
Filed: August 2, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2012 24 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Consolidate Cases. 11-cv-381-SM and 11-fp-484 are consolidated into the instant case, 11-cv-274-SM. 11-cv-381-SM, Gaskill v. Houston, et al. and 11-fp-484, Gaskill v. C .O. Azzara, et al. are statistically closed. Gaskill's requests for subpoenas are denied as premature, without prejudice to renewal should an evidentiary hearing be scheduled in this action. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jab)
February 21, 2012 30 Featured Case ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service upon the NH Office of the Attorney General; Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this order; plaintiff's request for appointed counsel is denied without prejudice to renewing his request should circumstances warrant, and plaintiff's request for subpoenas is denied without prejudice to renewal should the court schedule an evidentiary hearing or trial. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jab)
August 3, 2011 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. The initial filing fee is assessed in the amount of $16.00. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. IFP Consent Form due 8/29/2011. (amm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gaskill v. NH State Prison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH State Prison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gaskill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]