Fox v. Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent

Plaintiff: Duane Leroy Fox
Defendant: Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
 
Case Number: 1:2011fp00295
Filed: July 7, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2011 12 Featured Case ORDER denying 11 Motion to Extend Time FRAP 4 Appeal as of Right-When Taken. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch.(jab)
January 17, 2012 19 Featured Case ORDER: granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Amend 1 Complaint; denying 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 14 Motion to Appoint Counsel; and denying 16 Motion to Produce. Plaintiff is to file an amended complaint within 30 days from the date of this order. (Amended Pleadings due by 2/16/2012.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jab)
February 8, 2012 21 Featured Case ORDER approving 20 Report and Recommendations; denying 13 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
June 18, 2012 26 Featured Case ORDER Directing US Marshal to Make Service. Plaintiff has 90 days from the date of this order to provide the clerk's office with the names/addresses of the correctional officers who were working on E pod when the alleged assaults occurred. ( Notice of Compliance Deadline set for 9/17/2012.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jab)
July 30, 2012 30 Featured Case /// ORDER approving 25 Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge McCafferty dated June 18, 2012. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
September 10, 2012 35 Featured Case ORDER granting 33 Motion to to file an addendum [Amend] the 1 Complaint. The Court directs that counsel be appointed for the limited purpose of assisting the plaintiff in identifying defendants to his viable claims (on condition that the clerk's office can locate a willing pro bono counsel.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jab)
September 19, 2012 36 Featured Case ORDER appointing Attorney Christopher Cole, pro bono, re: 35 Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jab)
March 18, 2013 45 Featured Case ORDER Directing US Marshal to Make Service. clerk's Office to forward twenty-five blank summons forms to Plaintiff to complete and return within 14 days of receiving said blank summons forms. Upon receipt, clerk's office is to issue the summonses and forward to U.S. Marshal for service with the documents indicated in this order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jab)
July 7, 2011 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial filing fee of $70.58 is assessed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. IFP Consent Form due 7/28/2011. (amm)
April 17, 2013 55 Featured Case ORDER approving 46 Report and Recommendation, denying without prejudice 34 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
June 4, 2013 60 Featured Case ORDER denying 57 Defendants' Proposed Discovery Plan to the extent it is inconsistent with this scheduling order. (Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 9/10/2013; Discovery deadline 3/3/2014; Summary Judgment Motions due by 1/10/2014 and Ready for Trial on 5/20/2014) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jab)
June 26, 2013 64 Featured Case ORDER approving 61 Report and Recommendation; denying 49 Motion to Amend the Complaint ; denying 50 Motion to Amend the Complaint. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
November 7, 2013 67 Featured Case ///ORDER granting 65 defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lat)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fox v. Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Leroy Fox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]