Coleman v. Ford Motor Company

Plaintiff: Richard Coleman
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
 
Case Number: 1:2011fp00359
Filed: August 2, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
 
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2011 13 Featured Case PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for September 19, 2011 at 11:30 a.m. before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
September 20, 2011 15 Featured Case ORDER approving as outlined 14 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 5 days. Case Track: Complex. Affirmative defenses stricken as outlined. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Summary Judgment Motions due by 6/22/2012. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 12/22/2011. Mediation Follow Up on 5/31/2012.(dae)
February 29, 2012 17 Featured Case ORDER: Pursuant to Fed R Civ P 5(d) removing and striking 16 Notice of Second Answer to Defendant's Request for Disclosures by Richard Coleman. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(dae)
July 17, 2012 25 Featured Case ORDER denying 22 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas for Records of Valencia's Garage and Capital Auction and Deny Notice of Taking Deposition as to Sean Coleman. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
October 2, 2012 27 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Continue Trial and Pretrial Deadlines with Request for Expedited Treatment Under Local Rule 7.1(f). Deadlines as outlined. Oral argument on 21 Motion for Summary Judgment to be held October 11, 2012 at 3:00 p.m. unless notified by plaintiff as outlined. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
October 5, 2012 28 Featured Case ///ORDER denying 18 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Liability); granting 21 Motion for Summary Judgment. The oral arguments scheduled for October 11, 2012 are CANCELLED. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Coleman v. Ford Motor Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Coleman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Represented By: Trevor J. Keenan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]