Riley v. USA

Respondent: USA
Petitioner: Daniel Riley
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00047
Filed: February 6, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: George Z. Singal
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2012 12 Featured Case ORDER re 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Petitioner to notify Court by 7/1/2012 to indicate if he is waiving all statutory rights to counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Margaret J. Kravchuk.(ko)
July 12, 2012 16 Featured Case ORDER ON NONCONFORMING DOCUMENT re: 15 Motion to Amend 1 Motion to Vacate-2255 and Other Clarifications filed by Daniel Riley.( Cure Document by 7/23/2012.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Margaret J. Kravchuk.(jeb)
July 13, 2012 18 Featured Case ORDER ON NONCONFORMING DOCUMENT 17 Second Motion to Amend 1 Motion to Vacate - 2255 Motion. ( Cure Document by 7/30/2012.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Margaret J. Kravchuk.(jeb)
September 10, 2012 29 Featured Case ORDER denying 24 Motion Recuse New Hampshire United States Attorney's Office. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Margaret J. Kravchuk.(ko)
November 28, 2012 34 Featured Case ORDER granting 33 Motion for reply due date. Petitioners reply is due no later than December 26, 2012, and shall not exceed thirty (30) pages (inclusive of any exhibits and attachments). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Margaret J. Kravchuk.(ko)
February 25, 2013 40 Featured Case ORDER AFFIRMING 37 Report and Recommendation: Recommended Decision of Magistrate Judge is hereby AFFIRMED. Petitioner's 28 U.S.C. § 2255 Motion (ECF No. 1) is DENIED WITH PREJUDICE, and his Petition is DISMISSED. So Ordered by Judge George Z. Singal.(ko)
March 13, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER re 41 Addendum/Supplement to 39 Objection to Report and Recommendation, 42 Addendum/Second Supplement to 39 Objection to Report and Recommendation : Having reviewed the objections de novo and alternatively considered each as a motion seeking reconsideration, the Court hereby DENIES Petitioners Supplemental Objections. So Ordered by Judge George Z. Singal.(ko)
February 14, 2012 4 Featured Case CONCURRING ORDER re: 3 Designated Case Order Out: Judge George Z. Singal has been designated and assigned to preside over this case. USMJ Margaret J. Kravchuk is assigned to perform such duties as may be assigned to her by the district judge to whom this case is assigned. So Ordered by Chief Judge John A. Woodcock.(jeb)
February 23, 2012 6 Featured Case ORDER: The US Attorney is ordered to file an answer within 60 days or file a motion within 30 days, from the date of this order, re 1 Motion to Vacate Sentence - 2255. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Margaret J. Kravchuk.(ko)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Riley v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Riley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]