United States of America v. Limanni et al

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Artella E. Chase, Charles Limanni, Linda Limanni and Barrington, NH, Town of
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00114
Filed: March 26, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving as outlined 10 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 2 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Summary Judgment Motions due by 4/30/2013. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 10/31/2012. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 10/1/2012 for Joint Motion to Supplement Discovery Plan.(dae)
June 4, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion to Extend Deadline for Close of Discovery: Discovery extended to 7/2/13. To extent Mr. Limanni intends to pursue limited representation of counsel at his deposition, request to be filed on or before June 17, 2013. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(dae)
June 19, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting as outlined 16 Motion for Limited Representation of Counsel. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
July 30, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Service Document Requests. Discovery extended to 8/31/13. Trial and related deadlines will be rescheduled. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Limanni et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Karen Wozniak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artella E. Chase
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Limanni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Limanni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrington, NH, Town of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]