Fischer v. Firman et al

Defendant: Kelly Barton Firman, First National Bank Canada and Aaron Firman
Plaintiff: Madalyn Barton Fischer
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00146
Filed: April 12, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Barbadoro
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Motion to Transfer Case; approving 6 Report and Recommendations; denying 11 Motion to Amend. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(jna)
May 14, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER amended complaint due within 30 days 1 Complaint., ( Amended Pleadings due by 6/15/2012.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(mm)
June 19, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(mxm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fischer v. Firman et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Barton Firman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank Canada
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Firman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madalyn Barton Fischer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]