Azubuko v. Muirhead et al

Defendant: James R. Starr, USA, Paul Barbadoro, Daniel J. Lynch and James R. Muirhead
Plaintiff: Chukwuma E. Azubuko
Case Number: 1:2012cv00165
Filed: April 27, 2012
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Referring Judge: Lincoln D. Almond
Presiding Judge: Mary M. Lisi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 18:241 Conspiracy Against Citizen Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(jeb)
May 3, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jeb)
May 21, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 12 Designated Case Order Out Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi assigned to preside over this case. Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond is assigned to perform such duties as may be assigned to him by Chief Judge Lisi. So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi.(lml)
June 20, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 15 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi.(ko)
April 30, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(jeb)
April 30, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jeb)
April 30, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jeb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Azubuko v. Muirhead et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Starr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Barbadoro
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J. Lynch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Muirhead
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chukwuma E. Azubuko
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]