Clauson & Atwood v. Professionals Direct Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Clauson & Atwood
Third Party Defendant: Law Offices of Clauson, Atwood and Spaneas and K. William Clauson
Third Party Plaintiff: Professionals Direct Insurance Company
Counter Claimant: Professionals Direct Insurance Company
Defendant: Professionals Direct Insurance Company
Counter Defendant: Clauson & Atwood
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00199
Filed: May 29, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2012 13 Featured Case PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for August 28, 2012 at 11:00 a.m. before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
September 4, 2012 15 Featured Case ORDER approving as outlined 14 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 1-2 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Close of discovery - 1 week before summary judgment deadline (12/28/12). Summary Judgment Motions due by 1/4/2013. Mediation Follow Up on 1/4/2013.(dae)
April 25, 2013 25 Featured Case PROCEDURAL ORDER re 18 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. Parties to respond as outlined by April 30, 2013. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
May 13, 2013 27 Featured Case ///ORDER granting 18 Motion for Summary Judgment; striking 19 Objection to 18 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. PDIC's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. Clauson and C&A's cross-motion for summary judgment is STRICKEN as untimely. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Clauson & Atwood v. Professionals Direct Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clauson & Atwood
Represented By: K. William Clauson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party defendant: Law Offices of Clauson, Atwood and Spaneas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party defendant: K. William Clauson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party plaintiff: Professionals Direct Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark L. Mallory
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Professionals Direct Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark L. Mallory
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professionals Direct Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark L. Mallory
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Clauson & Atwood
Represented By: K. William Clauson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]