Ojo v. Hillsborough County Department of Corrections

Plaintiff: Osahenrumwen Ojo
Defendant: Hillsborough County Department of Corrections
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00204
Filed: May 30, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2012 18 Featured Case ORDER approving with minor amendments re: 17 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 3 days. Case Track: Standard; Summary Judgment Motions due by 9/16/2013; Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 3/1/2013, Discovery deadline 12/16/2013; Mediation Follow Up on 8/15/2013; denying as moot 15 Defendant's Motion to Strike. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jab)
March 12, 2013 26 Featured Case /// ORDER approving 24 Report and Recommendation; granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Amend 1 Complaint. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
September 25, 2012 6 Featured Case ORDER Directing US Marshal to Make Service. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jab)
October 2, 2012 8 Featured Case ORDER approving 5 Report and Recommendations, dismissing the section 1983 claim asserted against the Hillsborough County Department of Corrections. All other remaining claims are going forward. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
May 7, 2014 90 Featured Case ORDER denying 51 plaintiff's motion for summary judgment; denying 57 plaintiff's motion to compel defendant Gordon's and Cusson's responses to discovery requests; granting 63 defendants' motion to file supplemental affidavit; granting 67 defendants' motion for protective order; and denying 81 defendants' motion for summary judgment. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lat) Modified on 5/7/2014 to remove /// from docket entry. (jab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ojo v. Hillsborough County Department of Corrections
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osahenrumwen Ojo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County Department of Corrections
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]