Lagasse v. McLane/Eastern, Inc.

Plaintiff: Michele Lagasse
Defendant: McLane/Eastern, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00240
Filed: June 27, 2012
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER approving 9 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 1 1/2 to 2 days. Case Track: Standard. Affirmative defenses stricken without prejudice as outlined. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Summary Judgment Motions due by 6/21/2013. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 11/15/2012. Mediation Follow Up on 2/1/2013.(dae) Modified on 10/10/2012 to add: ///(dae).
October 18, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER (Corrected) approving 9 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 1 1/2 to 2 days. Case Track: Standard. Affirmative defenses stricken without prejudice as outlined. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Summary Judgment Motions due by 6/21/2013. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 11/15/2012. Mediation Follow Up on 2/1/2013. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(dae)
August 9, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for August 16, 2012 at 11:00 a.m. before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
August 15, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Pretrial Conference. Parties to confer as outlined. Tomorrow's preliminary pretrial conference is cancelled and will be rescheduled. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lagasse v. McLane/Eastern, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Lagasse
Represented By: Kenneth J. Barnes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLane/Eastern, Inc.
Represented By: Debra Weiss Ford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]