Baez-Gil v. USA

Petitioner: Angel Baez-Gil
Respondent: USA
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00266
Filed: July 16, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER denying 10 Amended 1 Motion to Vacate Sentence - 2255. Requested relief denied. Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. The clerk of court shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
July 2, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Petitioner shall make a filing showing cause as outlined by July 23, 2013. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
August 14, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Motion Alter or Amend Judgment under FRCP 59(e). So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
July 27, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 1 Motion to Vacate Sentence - 2255. U.S. Attorney to answer within 60 days or file motion to dismiss within 30 days. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
September 14, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pursuant to 18 USC § 3006A, Kenneth Glidden, Esq. shall be appointed to represent said defendant in this case until further order of the Court. A response to the Motion to Dismiss shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(ko)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Baez-Gil v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Angel Baez-Gil
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]