Media Digital, Inc. v. Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.

Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Media Digital, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00313
Filed: August 14, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for January 7, 2013 at 11:30 a.m. before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
January 3, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court SIGNED PROTECTIVE ORDER. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
March 26, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a), the above cases are consolidated for all purposes. The parties wishes for a pretrial limitation on consolidation were noted, but ultimately unavailing. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(ko)
April 15, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED ORDER granting 30 Motion for Reconsideration re 27 Order. Cases to proceed as outlined. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
April 24, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 38 Stipulation of Dismissal: IT IS ORDERED that all claims for relief asserted against Amazon.com, Inc. by Media Digital, Inc. are dismissed, with prejudice. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(ko)
May 1, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER: 13-cv-57 to be reopened and assigned to undersigned judge. Parties shall file pretrial filings as outlined to docket 12-cv-313. Trial, final pretrial filings and any stipulations of dismissal shall be filed as outlined. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
June 3, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER: Cases 12cv313, 13cv57, 13cv166, 13cv167, 13cv168 consolidated for pretrial filings as outlined to docket 12cv313. Trial, final pretrial filings and any stipulations of dismissal shall be filed as outlined. Parties to confer and file a joint discovery proposal as outlined by June 24, 2013. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
June 25, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 53 Discovery Plan with changes. Length of Trial 10 days. Case Track: Complex. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Summary Judgment Motions due by 1/20/2015. Mediation Follow Up on 5/30/2014.(ko)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Media Digital, Inc. v. Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Media Digital, Inc.
Represented By: David K. Pinsonneault
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]