Bohl v. Kelly Services, Inc. et al

Defendant: Kelly Services, Inc. and Freudenberg NOK General Partnership
Plaintiff: Karl F. Bohl
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00357
Filed: September 19, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2012 13 Featured Case PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for November 14, 2012 at 10:30 a.m. before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
November 9, 2012 14 Featured Case PROCEDURAL ORDER re subject matter jurisdiction. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
November 14, 2012 16 Featured Case ORDER approving 11 Discovery Plan as submitted/with changes. Length of Trial 3-5 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Summary Judgment Motions due by 7/25/2013. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 1/15/2013. Mediation Follow Up on 4/1/2013.(ko)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bohl v. Kelly Services, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Services, Inc.
Represented By: Rick J. Patterson
Represented By: Steven M. Potter
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Siegel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freudenberg NOK General Partnership
Represented By: Mark T. Broth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl F. Bohl
Represented By: Lauren S. Irwin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]